Eddy Rodriguez Tiqueira v. Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V., et al
Plaintiff: EDDY RODRIGUEZ TIQUEIRA, in, and as Special Administrator of the Estate of EDDY ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ, deceased and Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation, AEROLINEAS DAMOJH, S.A. de C.V., a foreign corporation, d/b/a GLOBAL AIR, The Boeing Company and Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02151
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Only Case No. 20-cv-2141 will be the operative case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mw, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Related Case No. 19cv 2552. Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/1/20.(gcy, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Boeing Company(Hamilton, Steven)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira by Austin William Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation by Steven David Hamilton [Corrected] (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018L011231) filed by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation [Corrected] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation by Steven David Hamilton (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018L011231) filed by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16913799. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hamilton, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddy Rodriguez Tiqueira v. Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDY RODRIGUEZ TIQUEIRA, in, and as Special Administrator of the Estate of EDDY ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation
Represented By: Steven David Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROLINEAS DAMOJH, S.A. de C.V., a foreign corporation, d/b/a GLOBAL AIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Steven David Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?