Altounian Construction, Inc. v. Administrative District Council 1 of Illinois of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers
Plaintiff: Altounian Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Administrative District Council 1 of Illinois of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO and Administrative District Council 1 of Illinois of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers
Case Number: 1:2020cv02180
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 7, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Altounian Construction, Inc. by Scott A. Gore (Gore, Scott)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Altounian Construction, Inc. by Thomas Stephen Bradley (Bradley, Thomas)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bradley, Thomas)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Altounian Construction, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16917984. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Award)(Bradley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altounian Construction, Inc. v. Administrative District Council 1 of Illinois of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altounian Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Stephen Bradley
Represented By: Scott A. Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative District Council 1 of Illinois of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative District Council 1 of Illinois of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?