Feintuch v. Crane et al
Plaintiff: Jack Feintuch
Defendant: Richard W. Mies, Linda Jojo, Christopher M. Crane, Ann C. Berzin, Joseph Nigro, Nicholas Debenedictis, Jeanne M. Jones, Joseph Dominguez, Exelon Corporation, John F. Young, Paul L. Joskow, Anne Pramaggiore, Stephen D. Steinour, Yves C. De Balmann, Anthony K. Anderson, Laurie Brlas, John M. Richardson, Mayo A. Shattuck III and Robert J. Lawless
Case Number: 1:2020cv02255
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Voluntary Dismiss Action #50 is granted. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Motion by Marvin Alan Miller for presentment of motion to dismiss #50 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/30/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Miller, Marvin)
July 27, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Jack Feintuch to dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Action (Miller, Marvin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #44 and #45 . Responses due by 7/31/2020. Replies due by 8/7/2020. Teleconference Status hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Connection with Dkt. 44 (Memorandum of Law) by Anthony K. Anderson, Ann C. Berzin, Laurie Brlas, Christopher M. Crane, Yves C. De Balmann, Nicholas Debenedictis, Joseph Dominguez, Exelon Corporation, Linda Jojo, Jeanne M. Jones, Paul L. Joskow, Robert J. Lawless, Richard W. Mies, Joseph Nigro, John M. Richardson, Mayo A. Shattuck III, Stephen D. Steinour, John F. Young (Atkinson, Stefan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 47 (Pursuant to Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 (Dkt. 43), Defendant Anne Pramaggiore has not noticed this motion for in-person presentment. Counsel for Ms. Pramaggiore is prepared to appear by telephone or videoconference should the Court notify the parties that a hearing is necessary) NOTICE of Motion by David Andrew Gordon for presentment of (Gordon, David)
July 14, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM by Anne Pramaggiore in support of motion to dismiss #45 (Gordon, David)
July 14, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION by Defendant Anne Pramaggiore to dismiss Verified Derivative Complaint (Gordon, David)
July 14, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION by Defendants Richard W. Mies, Nicholas Debenedictis, Joseph Dominguez, Christopher M. Crane, Jeanne M. Jones, Mayo A. Shattuck III, Joseph Nigro, Yves C. De Balmann, Anthony K. Anderson, Paul L. Joskow, John M. Richardson, John F. Young, Stephen D. Steinour, Exelon Corporation, Linda Jojo, Ann C. Berzin, Robert J. Lawless, Laurie Brlas to dismiss the Complaint (Atkinson, Stefan)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anne Pramaggiore by Jennifer Martin Wheeler (Wheeler, Jennifer)
June 30, 2020 Filing 41 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/30/2020. (lma, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status hearing set for 7/6/2020 is stricken and reset to 8/17/2020 at 9:30 AM with Initial Status Report due by 8/10/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/6/2020 at 9:30AM via telephone. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 6/29/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anne Pramaggiore by David Andrew Gordon (Gordon, David)
June 4, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anne Pramaggiore by Scott R. Lassar (Lassar, Scott)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #31 , #32 , #33 , #34 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 5/4/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16978775. (Blacklock, Evelyn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16978739. (Jackson, Kyla)
April 30, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16978682. (Atkinson, Stefan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16978634. (Goldstein, Sandra)
April 30, 2020 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND L.R. 3.2 by Exelon Corporation (Moten, Jaran)
April 28, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony K. Anderson, Ann C. Berzin, Laurie Brlas, Christopher M. Crane, Yves C. De Balmann, Nicholas Debenedictis, Joseph Dominguez, Exelon Corporation, Linda Jojo, Jeanne M. Jones, Paul L. Joskow, Robert J. Lawless, Richard W. Mies, Joseph Nigro, John M. Richardson, Mayo A. Shattuck III, Stephen D. Steinour, John F. Young by Jaran Ryal Moten (Moten, Jaran)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Stephen D. Steinour waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. John M. Richardson waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Richard W. Mies waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Stephen D. Steinour waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew) (Duplicate filing of entry no. #27 ) Modified on 4/21/2020 (lma, ).
April 20, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. John M. Richardson waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew) (Duplicate filing of entry no. #26 ) Modified on 4/21/2020 (lma, ).
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Anne Pramaggiore waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Richard W. Mies waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew) (Duplicate filing of entry no. #25 ) Modified on 4/21/2020 (lma, ).
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Robert J. Lawless waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Paul L. Joskow waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 4/21/2020) (lma, ).
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Jeanne M. Jones waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Linda Jojo waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Exelon Corporation waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Joseph Dominguez waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Nicholas Debenedictis waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Christopher M. Crane waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Laurie Brlas waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Ann C. Berzin waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Yves C. De Balmann waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jack Feintuch. Anthony K. Anderson waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Houston, Matthew)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion by Matthew M. Houston for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/16/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16935052. (Houston, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jack Feintuch by Andrew Szot (Szot, Andrew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jack Feintuch by Marvin Alan Miller (Miller, Marvin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, Marvin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jack Feintuch; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16925000. (Attachments: #1 Feintuch Verification)(Miller, Marvin)
April 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feintuch v. Crane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Mies
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Jojo
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Crane
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann C. Berzin
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Nigro
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Debenedictis
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne M. Jones
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dominguez
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Young
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Joskow
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Pramaggiore
Represented By: David Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Jennifer Martin Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Steinour
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves C. De Balmann
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony K. Anderson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Brlas
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Richardson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo A. Shattuck III
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Lawless
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Jaran Ryal Moten
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Stefan Howard Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Feintuch
Represented By: Andrew Szot
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller
Represented By: Matthew M Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?