Martino vs The Orchard Enterprises Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Martino
Defendant: Medianet, Inc, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. and Independent Online Distribution Alliance Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv02267
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service (Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant The Orchard Enterprises, Inc.) by Anthony Martino (Martino, Anthony)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiff's (2ND Amended Complaint) by Anthony Martino (Martino, Anthony)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Second AMENDED complaint by Anthony Martino against All Defendants (Martino, Anthony)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) by Anthony Martino (Martino, Anthony)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 First AMENDED complaint by Anthony Martino against All Defendants (With Corrected Captions) (Martino, Anthony)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED complaint by Anthony Martino against All Defendants (Martino, Anthony)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Martino as to Medianet, Inc on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Martino, Anthony)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Martino as to The Orchard Enterprises Inc. on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Martino, Anthony)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Martino as to Independent Online Distribution Alliance Inc on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Martino, Anthony)
April 17, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Independent Online Distribution Alliance Inc, Medianet, Inc, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. (ng, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Martino; Jury Demand. (Check in the amount of $400 received on 4/16/2020 but not yet processed.)(lw, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Anthony Martino. (nsf, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Anthony Martino.(Exhibits)(nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martino vs The Orchard Enterprises Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medianet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orchard Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Online Distribution Alliance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?