Carlson v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa C. Carlson
Defendant: Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee, Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02323
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dimsiss #9 is due by 5/21/2020. Defendants' reply is due by 6/3/2020. No appearance is required on 5/7/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Caleb J. Halberg for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/7/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Halberg, Caleb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Nationstar Mortgage LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6.24.16 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Report of Proceedings 9.27.17, #3 Exhibit C - Occupants Amended Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims in Eviction Case)(Halberg, Caleb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Halberg, Caleb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa C. Carlson by Norman James Lerum (Lerum, Norman)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ecw, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ecw, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Halberg, Caleb)
April 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee, Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company by Caleb J. Halberg (Halberg, Caleb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Halberg, Caleb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Lake County, IL, case number (20 L 00000161) filed by Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee, Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16933142. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Halberg, Caleb)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2016-1 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa C. Carlson
Represented By: Norman James Lerum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?