Escarza v. The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee for CWHEQ Inc., Home Equity Loan Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-S10 et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Escarza
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for CWHEQ Inc., Home Equity Loan Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-S10, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2020cv02341
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Escarza as to McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Payton, Rusty)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Escarza as to The Bank of New York Mellon on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Payton, Rusty)
May 15, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (ng, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, ) Modified on 4/16/2020 (rc, ).
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carlos Escarza by Rusty A. Payton (Payton, Rusty)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carlos Escarza; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16935101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note & Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - FC Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, Rusty)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escarza v. The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee for CWHEQ Inc., Home Equity Loan Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-S10 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for CWHEQ Inc., Home Equity Loan Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-S10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Escarza
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?