Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A et al
Plaintiff: Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC
Defendant: RCSH Operations, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Phunware, Inc. and RCSH Operations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02523
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: As the parties propose #91 , the next status report is due on or before 8/22/2022. Mailed notice (mjc, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STATUS Report /Joint Status Report by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Claydon, Jonathan)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The parties are directed to file a brief status report on the status of arbitration proceedings on or before 2/23/2022. In order to avoid filing unnecessary status reports, the parties are encouraged to propose as a deadline for filing the next status report a date by which they believe a significant step in the arbitration is likely to have been taken. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Christopher Dore's motion (No. #88 ) for leave to withdraw his appearance for plaintiff is granted. In addition to this case, counsel seeks to withdraw in Ajira AI, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., No. 20-cv-4428, but did not file a motion on the docket of that case. Mr. Dore did not file an appearance in No. 20-cv-4428, and he does not appear on the docket sheet as counsel of record for any party. If this is incorrect and Mr. Dore requires leave to withdraw in No. 20-cv-4428, he should promptly file a motion on the docket of that case. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION by Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC to withdraw Christopher L. Dore as Counsel of Record (Dore, Christopher)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 8/10/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter memorandum opinion and order granting defendant's motion (No. #59 ) to stay and compel arbitration. In accordance with the memorandum opinion and order, this case is stayed. The parties are ordered to arbitrate their dispute consistent with the memorandum opinion and order. If arbitration proceedings remain pending on February 11, 2022, a brief status report is due on that date. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Claydon, Jonathan)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Supplemental) (Ferak, Paul)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/5/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter memorandum opinion and order granting defendant Phunware, Inc.'s motion (No. #25 ) to dismiss count VI of the amended complaint (No. #69 ) for lack of personal jurisdiction. See the memorandum opinion and order for details. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The motion for leave to withdraw (No. #80 ) the appearance of attorney Daniel Schneider is granted. Mr. Schneider may withdraw his appearance for plaintiff. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION by Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC to withdraw Daniel Schneider as Counsel of Record (Richman, Benjamin)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Daniel T. Graham has filed a notice (No. #78 ) withdrawing the appearance of Timothy R. Herman for defendant Phunware, Inc., because Mr. Herman left the employ of his law firm effective December 31, 2020, which notice the court construes as a motion to withdraw under Local Rule 83.17. Because other attorneys from Mr. Herman's former firm continue to represent this defendant, the court infers that no prejudice will result from the withdrawal and grants the motion. Mr. Herman may withdraw his appearance for defendant Phunware, Inc. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 WITHDRAWING Timothy Herman as counsel for Defendant Phunware, Inc. and substituting Daniel Thomas Graham as counsel of record (Graham, Daniel)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant's unopposed motion (No. #75 ) for leave to file a 19-page consolidated reply brief in support of its motion to stay and compel arbitration is granted. Defendant's reply (No. #76 ) is deemed filed with leave of court. Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY Brief by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.Ain Support of MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A for leave to file Instanter Oversized Consolidated Reply Brief in Support of Motions to Compel Arbitration #75 , MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A to stay Further Processing and Compel Arbitration #59 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Ferak, Paul)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A for leave to file Instanter Oversized Consolidated Reply Brief in Support of Motions to Compel Arbitration (Ferak, Paul)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A by Paul Joseph Ferak (Ferak, Paul)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff's unopposed motion (No. #72 ) for leave to file a 20-page response to defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion to stay and compel arbitration is granted. Plaintiff's response (No. #71 ) is deemed filed with leave of court.Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC for leave to file excess pages (Thomassen, Benjamin)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE by Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A to stay Further Processing and Compel Arbitration #59 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Perti, #2 Declaration Mehta, #3 Declaration Hawkins-Armstrong)(Thomassen, Benjamin)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY by Defendant Phunware, Inc. to motion to dismiss #25 in Support (Graham, Daniel)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 First AMENDED complaint by Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Phunware, Inc. (Richman, Benjamin)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The parties have stipulated (No. #67 ) to the filing of an amended complaint dropping defendants RCSH Operations, LLC and RCSH Operations, Inc. (collectively "RCSH"). RCSH's pending motion (No. #35 ) to dismiss the original complaint is therefore denied as moot. Also, as agreed by the parties, defendant Phunware, Inc.'s motion (No. #25 ) to dismiss the original complaint and defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion (No. #59 ) to stay and compel arbitration shall apply to plaintiff's amended complaint (No. [67-1]). Plaintiff is directed to file its amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Mailed notice (mjc)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Richman, Benjamin)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal (No. #65 ), purporting to dismiss without prejudice its claims against certain defendants: RCSH Operations, LLC, and RCSH Operations, Inc., (collectively "RCSH"). Plaintiff cites Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which authorizes voluntary dismissal without a court order of "an action" before an answer or motion for summary judgment has been filed. The Seventh Circuit has held that the word "action" used in Rule 41(a) "means the entire case." Taylor v. Brown, 787 F.3d 851, 857 (7th Cir. 2015) (citing Berthold Types Ltd. v. Adobe Sys. Inc., 242 F.3d 772, 777 (7th Cir. 2001)). Thus, in a case in which the plaintiff attempted to drop his claim against one of many defendants, " Rule 41(a) was not the proper vehicle. Instead, the court should have offered [the plaintiff] the opportunity to amend his pleadings under Rule 15(a)." Id. at 858. Under the Seventh Circuit's binding interpretation of Rule 41(a), plaintiff must follow Rule 15(a), which governs the amendment of a complaint, to drop its claims against RCSH. Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) only as to Defendants RCSH Operations, LLC and RCSH Operations, Inc. (Richman, Benjamin)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE by Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Phunware, Inc. to dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), AND 12(b)(6) #25 (Richman, Benjamin)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: In accordance with defendant's status report (No. #62 ) filed 10/7/2020, defendant's first motion (No. #58 ) to stay and compel arbitration is withdrawn. The second such motion [No. #59 ) remains pending.Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STATUS Report by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Claydon, Jonathan)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: On 10/5/2020, defendant filed two apparently identical motions (Nos. #58 and #59 ) to stay further proceedings and to compel arbitration as well as a single memorandum of law (No. #60 ). Defendant is directed to file a short status report on or before 10/7/2020 indicating whether it intended to file two motions and, if not, which motion defendant wishes to withdraw. Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A in support of motion to stay #59 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Claydon, Jonathan)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A to stay Further Proceedings and Compel Arbitration (Claydon, Jonathan) Modified on 10/6/2020 (pj, ).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A to stay (Cedillos, Michael). (Duplicate filing of entry no. 59) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/6/2020) (pj, ).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting agreed motion regarding schedule for briefing defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion to compel arbitration and response if this matter is not compelled to arbitration. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/18/2020.Mailed notice(mjc, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter order granting the agreed motion #55 of plaintiff and defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("Chase"), to set an agreed briefing schedule. In accordance with the order, Chase's anticipated motion to compel arbitration is briefed as follows: motion due: 10/5/2020; response due: 11/2/2020; reply due: 11/23/2020. Chase's motion to compel arbitration shall be decided before any further response to the complaint, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) or otherwise, is due. If the court denies Chase's motion to compel arbitration, Chase's response to the complaint shall be due on or before thirty (30) days after the court issues its ruling on the motion to compel arbitration. Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A for order - Agreed Motion re: schedule for Briefing Motion to Compel Arbitration and Response (Claydon, Jonathan)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The minute entry #53 entered 9/10/2020 is withdrawn because it applies to the related cases but does not apply to this action, No. 20-CV-2523. Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: This case has been reassigned to Judge Gottschall's calendar as related to Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn, LLC v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al. ("Sha-Poppin"), No. 20-CV-2523. All settings are stricken. On or before 9/17/2020, the parties are directed to file a short status report giving their views on modifying the schedule for responding to the complaint in this case to align with the schedule established in Sha-Poppin (see ECF No. #45 ). Counsel in all three related actions are encouraged to confer and agree on a single schedule for all three cases.Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The motion #47 of defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("JP Morgan"), for an extension of its deadline to respond to plaintiff's motion #43 for a finding of relatedness is granted. This court considered JP Morgan's response #49 filed 8/28/2020 in reaching its decision #51 , and the response #49 is deemed timely filed. Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/4/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter order granting plaintiff's motion #43 for a finding of relatedness under Local Rule 40.4 of this court. In compliance with Local Rule 40.4(b), a copy of this order will be forwarded to the Executive Committee and the judges presiding over the related cases.Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief #43 (Claydon, Jonathan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC by Benjamin Scott Thomassen (Thomassen, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for miscellaneous relief #43 (Claydon, Jonathan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Any response to plaintiff's motion to relate cases #43 is due on or before 8/21/2020 after which date the motion will be taken under advisement. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The schedule proposed by the parties in their status report #44 filed 8/14/2020 is adopted. Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #1 on or before 9/18/2020. Plaintiff may file a consolidated response to all motions to dismiss the complaint (see #25 and #35 ), not to exceed 30 pages in length, on or before 10/12/2020. Any replies must be filed on or before 11/2/2020. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATUS Report Joint by Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC (Richman, Benjamin)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC to Relate Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Richman, Benjamin)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: On August 4, 2020, the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation denied #41 the motions to transfer this action, and the stay entered July 9, 2020, was lifted. The deadline of September 16, 2020, to file a status report is stricken. Two motions to dismiss the complaint have been filed, and some defendants have not answered or otherwise responded to the complaint. A status report proposing a coordinated schedule for answering or otherwise responding to the complaint and for briefing the motions to dismiss is due on or before August 14, 2020. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Transfer (bg, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/9/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter order granting the stipulated motion #33 to stay filed by plaintiff and defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. In accordance with the order, this action is stayed pending a decision on the motions to transfer in In re JP Morgan Chase Paycheck Protection Plan Litigation., MDL No. 2944 (J.P.M.L). If the JPML has not ruled by 9/16/2020, a brief status report is due on that date. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE by Phunware, Inc., RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A to stay [Stipulated] #33 (Graham, Daniel)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Memorandum in Support by RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLC of Defendants RCSH Operations, LLC and RCSH Operations, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Roth, Martin)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLC (Roth, Martin)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., and plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Foods, LLC, have filed a stipulated motion #33 to stay this action temporarily pending a decision on the motions to transfer in In re JPMorgan Chase Paycheck Protection Plan Litig., MDL No. 2944). The position of defendants RCSH Operations, LLC, and Phunware, Inc., cannot be determined from the face of the motion. If either defendant opposes the motion, a response must be filed on or before July 3, 2020, or the motion will be deemed unopposed. This procedure would have been unnecessary had the moving parties followed the instructions on Judge Gottschall's page on the court's website requiring the first page of all motions to state clearly whether the motion is opposed. Mailed notice (mjc, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A to stay [Stipulated] (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Claydon, Jonathan)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A by Thomas Sotos (Sotos, Thomas)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Corporate Interest STATEMENT by Phunware, Inc. (Graham, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The unopposed motion #23 of defendants RCSH Operations, LLC and RCSH Operations, Inc. to extend their deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to and including 6/30/2020 is granted. The court has been advised that motions to transfer this case are pending before the Joint Panel on Multi-District Litigation. Accordingly, and in view of the fact that several defendants have until 6/30/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, the motion #25 of Phunware, Inc. to dismiss the complaint is briefed as follows: response due: 7/28/2020; reply due: 8/13/2020. Mailed notice (mjc, )
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phunware, Inc. by Maureen J Moody (Moody, Maureen)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phunware, Inc. by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Phunware, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #25 PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), AND 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graham, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Phunware, Inc. to dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), AND 12(b)(6) (Graham, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phunware, Inc. by Daniel Thomas Graham (Graham, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Roth, Martin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RCSH Operations, LLC (Roth, Martin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RCSH Operations, Inc. (Roth, Martin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLC by Katie R. Lencioni (Lencioni, Katie)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLC by Martin L. Roth (Roth, Martin)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Based on the extension of 6/30/20 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, the status report due date set for 6/29/20 is stricken and reset to 7/13/20. Mailed notice (mjc, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/30/20 #15 is granted. The motion hearing set for 5/15/20 is stricken. Mailed notice (mjc,)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 5/15/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed) (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A by Jonathan Hale Claydon (Claydon, Jonathan)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before June 29, 2020. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with Third Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/28/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction (rc, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Entered in Error. (rc, ).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Phunware, Inc., RCSH Operations, Inc., RCSH Operations, LLC. (ng, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC by Daniel Joshua Schneider (Schneider, Daniel)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC by Christopher Lillard Dore (Dore, Christopher)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelson, Jay)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16953157.(Edelson, Jay)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCSH Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Katie R. Lencioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: Paul Joseph Ferak
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Claydon
Represented By: Thomas Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phunware, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Graham
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCSH Operations, LLC
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Katie R. Lencioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn LLC
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Christopher Lillard Dore
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?