Palmer v. City Of Markham et al
Plaintiff: Kyung Palmer
Defendant: City Of Markham and Terry White
Case Number: 1:2020cv02603
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Kyung Palmer (Slaughter, Wayne)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyung Palmer as to Terry White on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Samuels, Jeanette)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyung Palmer as to City Of Markham on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Samuels, Jeanette)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance Form by Kyung Palmer (Slaughter, Wayne)
June 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City Of Markham, Terry White. (ng, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kyung Palmer by Brendan Shiller (Shiller, Brendan)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before June 29, 2020. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with Third Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/30/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, )
April 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kyung Palmer by Jeanette Samuels (Samuels, Jeanette)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kyung Palmer; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16974002. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Samuels, Jeanette)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. City Of Markham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyung Palmer
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?