Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc. v. Compass Bank
Plaintiff: Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc.
Defendant: Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass, an Alabama banking corporation and WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02620
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the status report #9 filed on 6/12/2020, the status hearing set for 6/18/2020 is stricken and reset to 8/11/2020 at 9:45 a.m. Defendant's time to answer, move to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction or otherwise plead until is extended until 8/3/2020. A revised joint status report is due no later than 8/7/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report by Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc. (Polales, Dean)
May 29, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Compass Bank. (ng, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 6/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
April 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc. by Timothy Edward Horton (Horton, Timothy)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc. by Dean J. Polales (Polales, Dean)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Polales, Dean)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16975360. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Polales, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc. v. Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Truck & Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: Dean J. Polales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass, an Alabama banking corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?