Gates v. Bartlett Park District
Plaintiff: Grayce Gates
Defendant: Bartlett Park District
Case Number: 1:2020cv02631
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Bartlett Park District (McNicholas, Alexandra)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Bartlett Park District(McNicholas, Alexandra)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 8/24/20 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 8/24/20 at 9:15 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw== In the event that any party has any objections to this order, an objection must be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the telephone conference. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report seven business days before the hearing in accordance with the standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 7/13/20 at 9:15 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw== In the event that any party has any objections to this order, an objection must be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the telephone conference. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report seven business days before the hearing in accordance with the standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Court's website.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Grayce Gates regarding Complaint, Summons, MIDP served on Bartlett Park District on 5/15/20 (Martin, John)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bartlett Park District by David A Moore (Moore, David)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bartlett Park District by Alexandra McNicholas (McNicholas, Alexandra)
May 11, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bartlett Park District. (ng, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grayce Gates by Jonathon Lamont Hoeven (Hoeven, Jonathon)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grayce Gates by Paul W. Ryan (Ryan, Paul)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grayce Gates by Eugene K. Hollander (Hollander, Eugene)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
April 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Grayce Gates; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16977618. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, John)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Bartlett Park District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartlett Park District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grayce Gates
Represented By: John Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?