Khan v. Azeez
Plaintiff: Javeed Khan
Defendant: Reshma Azeez
Case Number: 1:2020cv02711
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to strike the answer to the complaint and the counterclaim #18 is due 7/13/20, plaintiff's reply is due 7/20/20. Mailed notice (air, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Javeed Khan, Counter Defendant Javeed Khan to strike answer to complaint, counterclaim #11 - Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Alternative Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims (Warner, Daniel)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Javeed Khan, Javeed Khan in Opposition to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #12 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #7 - Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Warner, Daniel)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Reshma Azeez by John D. Gorby (Gorby, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: By order of 6/11/20 #8 , this Court directed attorney John Gorby, who has filed a motion to dismiss the complaint #7 and an answer to complaint and counterclaims #11 on behalf of defendant Azeez, to file his appearance on the docket by 6/15/20 and advised that failure to do so would result in striking the motion. No appearance has been filed. Instead, attorney Gorby has since filed an answer and counterclaims on the defendant's behalf. Local Rule 83.16(d) requires the filing of an appearance form "prior to or simultaneously with the filing of any motion." The Court will extend one further opportunity to attorney Gorby to file the required appearance form. Absent the filing of an appearance form by 6/24/20, the defendant's motion to dismiss, answer, and counterclaims will be stricken. Mailed notice (air, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Javeed Khan, Counter Defendant Javeed Khan by Daniel Robert Warner (Warner, Daniel)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #12 is identical to the previously filed motion #7 . The briefing schedule on the original motion remains in place. Mailed notice (air, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Counter Claimant Reshma Azeez to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Gorby, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Reshma Azeez against Javeed Khan . by Reshma Azeez(Gorby, John) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bg, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney Daniel R. Warner's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Counsel is directed to file his appearance on behalf of the plaintiff. Mailed notice (air, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17103254. Motion For Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Motion)(Warner, Daniel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss #7 is due by 6/26/20. Defendant's reply is due by 7/10/20. Attorney Gorby is instructed to enter an appearance on behalf of defendant by 6/15/20 or the motion will be stricken.Mailed notice (air, )
May 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Reshma Azeez to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and memorandum in support (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 5/30/2020) (bg, )
May 30, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from attorney John D. Gorby dated 5/29/2020. (Envelope postmarked 5/30/2020) (bg, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
May 5, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Reshma Azeez. (ng, )
May 5, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Donnelly, Stephen)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Javeed Khan; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16988343. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Verification)(Donnelly, Stephen)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Azeez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javeed Khan
Represented By: Stephen Michael Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reshma Azeez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?