Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv02719
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 6, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant John Doe. (ng, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file plaintiff's complaint and return of service under seal #6 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Complaint-Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC to seal - Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Complaint and Return of Service Under Seal (Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (rp, )
May 5, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing FRCP 7.1 and LR 3.2 Disclosure by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Tallman, Samuel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Samuel J. Tallman (Tallman, Samuel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Tallman, Samuel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16989338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tallman, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Samuel J. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?