Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02726
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Tallman, Samuel)
June 12, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant John Doe. (ng, )
May 31, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file its Complaint and return of service under seal #6 is granted. Notice of motion date of 6/2/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Initial status hearing remains set for 7/8/2020. Joint status report is due no later than 7/3/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Samuel J. Tallman for presentment of motion to seal #6 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/2/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Tallman, Samuel)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr:Initial status hearing is set for 7/8/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (pj, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Complaint-Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC to seal - Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Complaint and Return of Service Under Seal (Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Samuel J. Tallman (Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tallman, Samuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16991236. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tallman, Samuel)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?