Parker v. Jeffreys
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Parker
Defendant: IDOC Director Rob Jeffreys
Case Number: 1:2020cv02764
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Southern District of Illinois as case 3:20-cv-00551, filed 06/10/2020. (bg, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois, Benton Division the electronic record. (sxb, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: For the reasons stated below, this lawsuit is transferred to the Southern District of Illinois, Benton Division, for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall effectuate the transfer forthwith. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/10/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and no copies by Christopher L. Parker (Exhibits) (sxb, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher L. Parker for temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction (sxb, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher L. Parker for temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction (sxb, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher L. Parker to proceed as a poor person (Exhibit) (sxb, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Christopher L. Parker (sxb, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC Director Rob Jeffreys
Represented By: Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?