Rosa et al v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Jose M. Rosa and Ana Rosa
Defendant: Jelonnie R. Jones and Euro United LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02873
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants Euro United LLC, Jelonnie R. Jones Discovery (Malartsik, Jon)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 HIPAA PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 6/15/2020. Mailed notice (rp, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Euro United LLC, Jelonnie R. Jones for protective order Pursuant to HIPAA (Malartsik, Jon)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Euro United LLC, Jelonnie R. Jones (Malartsik, Jon)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ana Rosa, Jose M. Rosa by Thomas Michael Connelly (Connelly, Thomas)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ana Rosa, Jose M. Rosa by Craig Daniel Brown (Brown, Craig)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Euro United LLC(Malartsik, Jon)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Euro United LLC by Jon P. Malartsik (Malartsik, Jon)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jelonnie R. Jones(Malartsik, Jon)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pj, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED civil cover sheet #2 Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Malartsik, Jon)
May 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jelonnie R. Jones by Jon P. Malartsik (Malartsik, Jon)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Malartsik, Jon)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Clerk of the Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020L002229) filed by Jelonnie R. Jones Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17008477. (Malartsik, Jon)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosa et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jelonnie R. Jones
Represented By: Jon P. Malartsik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro United LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?