Mickelson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Carly M Mickelson and Carly M. Mickelson
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul, Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv02995
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Beth W Jantz
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY by Carly M. Mickelson to Response #25 (Fisher, Robert)
April 27, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendant Andrew M. Saul to motion for summary judgment #19 (Kelly, Kathryn)
March 26, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Defendant's unopposed motion for a second extension of time #23 is granted. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's brief is due 4/28/21, and Plaintiff's reply is due 5/12/21. Mailed notice. (pk, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #19 Unopposed (Kelly, Kathryn)
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's brief #21 is granted. Defendant's response shall be filed by 03/29/2021. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by 04/12/2021. (rbf, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #19 Unopposed (Kelly, Kathryn)
January 11, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Carly M. Mickelson in support of motion for summary judgment #19 (Fisher, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Carly M. Mickelson for summary judgment (Fisher, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Andrew Saul (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Kelly, Kathryn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The Government's motion for second extension of time to file the certified administrative record #16 is granted without objection from plaintiff. The certified administrative record shall be filed on or before 11/17/2020. (rbf, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kelly, Kathryn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Defendant's motion for extension to file the electronic certified Administrative Record and answer to Plaintiff's complaint #16 is granted. The administrative record is due on 09/18/2020. Plaintiff's opening brief is due 11/17/2020; Response due 01/01/2021; Reply due 01/15/2021. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Jantz's standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Jantz's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. (rbf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kelly, Kathryn)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carly M. Mickelson as to Andrew Saul on 6/2/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fisher, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carly M. Mickelson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fisher, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carly M. Mickelson as to Andrew Saul served on 6/10/2020, answer due 8/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fisher, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz:This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jantz. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, within 60 days after the filing of the administrative record, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file a response and brief in support of affirming the decision subject to review. The plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Jantz's standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Jantz's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Given the current public health situation, this Court will accommodate reasonable requests for extensions in the coming weeks, and counsel and the parties should show flexibility and be willing to accommodate each other as well. (rbf, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Beth W. Jantz, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/2/2020. (lma, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Fisher, Robert)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Saul (Kelly, Kathryn)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 26, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ng, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carly M Mickelson by Robert Emery Fisher (Fisher, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fisher, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carly M Mickelson; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17030505.(Fisher, Robert)
May 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mickelson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carly M Mickelson
Represented By: Robert Emery Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carly M. Mickelson
Represented By: Robert Emery Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?