Wagner v. SPEEDWAY, LLC.
Plaintiff: Atheena Wagner
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03014
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 Exhibit A to Dkt. 19 - Speedway LLC's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Stay by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Wolfe, Matthew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by SPEEDWAY, LLC. in support of motion to stay #18 (Wolfe, Matthew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. to stay Pending Resolution of Related Case (Wolfe, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Kristen Page's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint #10 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 7/17/2020. Attorney William C. Martucci's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17126558. (Page, Kristen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Wolfe, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17125899. (Martucci, William)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. by Jonathon M. Studer (Studer, Jonathon)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 [UNOPPOSED] (Wolfe, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atheena Wagner as to SPEEDWAY, LLC. on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Ficzko, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. (ng, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atheena Wagner by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atheena Wagner by Andrew C. Ficzko (Ficzko, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atheena Wagner by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Atheena Wagner re complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - OPT-IN FORM OF ATHEENA WAGNER)(Ficzko, Andrew)
May 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ficzko, Andrew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Atheena Wagner; YES. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17032701.(Ficzko, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. SPEEDWAY, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC.
Represented By: Kristen A. Page
Represented By: William C Martucci
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Jonathon M. Studer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atheena Wagner
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?