Torres v. North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern et al
Plaintiff: Juan Torres
Defendant: Jim Heflin and North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern
Case Number: 1:2020cv03033
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jim Heflin, North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern(Burnet, Allie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants have until 8/25/20 to file their answers or responsive pleadings. Status hearing set for 10/8/20 at 9:00 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Juan Torres (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jim Heflin, North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern by Lori Ann Vanderlaan (Vanderlaan, Lori)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jim Heflin, North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern by Allie Burnet (Burnet, Allie)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Juan Torres. Jim Heflin waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Juan Torres. North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia)
June 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern. (acm, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff is directed to make all reasonable efforts to effectuate service upon Defendants by 7/24/20. The parties are directed to file a joint status report on 8/15/20. The report, which shall be as concise as possible, shall set forth: (1) the current deadlines imposed by the Court and whether the matter has been referred to the Magistrate Judge in any fashion (e,g., for discovery supervision; for resolution of a motion; for settlement; etc.); (2) the progress of discovery, if discovery is ongoing; (3) the status of briefing on unresolved motions, if any; (4) whether the parties have engaged or are engaging in settlement discussions and the status of those discussions; (5) for cases without any future court dates, an agreed proposed schedule; (6) for cases that have future court dates and if the parties believe there is good cause to extend the current deadlines, a proposed amended schedule and the basis for the request; (7) a request for any agreed action that the Court can take without a hearing; (8) and whether the parties believe a telephonic hearing or in-person hearing is necessary within the next 60 days, and, if so, the issue(s) that warrants discussion and the parties' respective positions. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Juan Torres (Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court orders the parties to file a joint status report by June 16, 2020. The report, which shall be as concise as possible, shall address: (1) the progress of discovery; (2) the status of briefing on any unresolved motions; (3) for cases without any future court dates, an agreed proposed schedule for the next 60 days; (4) for cases that have future court dates, an agreed revised schedule if the current schedule needs revision; (5) a request for any agreed action that the Court can take without a hearing; (6) whether the parties believe a telephonic hearing or in-person hearing is necessary in the immediate future, and, if so, the issue(s) that warrants discussion.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction (rc, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR. (rc, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rc, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Torres by Kimberly A. Hilton (Hilton, Kimberly)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Torres by Thalia Pacheco Argomaniz (Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Torres by David J. Fish (Fish, David)
May 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Juan Torres; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17034636. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J. Torres Notice of Right to Sue)(Pacheco Argomaniz, Thalia) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Heflin
Represented By: Allie Burnet
Represented By: Lori Ann Vanderlaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Inn Corp., d/b/a Hopsmith Tavern
Represented By: Allie Burnet
Represented By: Lori Ann Vanderlaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Torres
Represented By: David J. Fish
Represented By: Kimberly A. Hilton
Represented By: Thalia Pacheco Argomaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?