Sabal et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Roman Luke Sabal
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj, US Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Service, Matthew T. Albence, Chad F. Wolf, Director Martha Medina-Maltes, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, Martha Medina-Maltes and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv03034
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), all scheduled hearings and deadlines are stricken and any pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roman Luke Sabal (Glenn, Dylan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond #19 is granted. Defendant' answer or responsive pleadings are due on 12/1/2020. Mailed notice (air, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Agreed (Oswald, Craig)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendants' unopposed motion to extend #17 is granted. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 9/2/20. Mailed notice (air, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Agreed (Treacy, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf (Treacy, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf (Oswald, Craig)
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roman Luke Sabal by Helen Boyer (Boyer, Helen)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roman Luke Sabal by Talia R. Inlender (Inlender, Talia)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorneys Talia Inlender's and Helen Boyer's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 #10 are granted. No appearances on the motions are required. Counsel are directed to file their appearances on behalf of the plaintiff. Mailed notice (air, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17062932. (Boyer, Helen)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17062327. (Inlender, Talia)
May 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney.(ng, )
May 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes. (ng, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roman Luke Sabal by Kirsten Caroline Lee (Lee, Kirsten)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roman Luke Sabal by Caitlin E Dahl (Dahl, Caitlin)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roman Luke Sabal by Robert Collins, III (Collins, Robert)
May 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roman Luke Sabal by Dylan Patrick Glenn (Glenn, Dylan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Glenn, Dylan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Complaint to Compel Defendants to Adjudicate Plaintiff's Naturalization Application Pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 702, 706(1) and 28 U. S. C. 1361 filed by Roman Luke Sabal; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17034747.(Glenn, Dylan)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabal et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Martha Medina-Maltes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Medina-Maltes
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Luke Sabal
Represented By: Dylan Patrick Glenn
Represented By: Caitlin E Dahl
Represented By: Robert Collins, III
Represented By: Kirsten Caroline Lee
Represented By: Helen Boyer
Represented By: Talia R. Inlender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?