ABC Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: ABC Corporation and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", HVIERO VIP Store, CarZB Co.,Ltd. Store, YaLa VIP Store, zhengsheng store, Yanzhiqi Car Styling Trading Co. Ltd.. Store, Leono Store, ZQ car lights Store, Shop5009127 Store, FUWAYDA Official Store, Govi Racing store, J&F Imp & Exp, Car Accessories A Store, carmarry store, Shop831232 Store, Shop5134082 Store, zexuanlin1982 Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, Aozong Car light Store, Shop5573145 Store, racbox worklight store, Ronan Official Store, HTPOW Car Accessories Store, superwind car Store, Chichang lamps Store, pilot e store, Car & Motorcycle Accessories Store, Autor & Motorcycles Store, EXN OFFICIAL STORE, HoneyBaby Store, Shop4687086 Store, DXZ Car-Parts Store, SUNG Auto Lighting & Electronics, gaowu car products store, NEWM Nanjing Newsuns Store, YY is Car Lights Store, The Car Factory Store, Automotive lighting fittings Store, Seineca Store, xplus official store, Leites Official Store, CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, YY xenonlight & LEDlight Store, yesplease store, CAR KEY FACTORY, SL Store, pftkjcp company online store, wy car store, Dianacar Store, Globale Car & Motor Store, LB Flyying Car Store, Shop5075353 Store, HVIERO Official Store, Running Cars, Autoeaglerich, HX-CarLight Store, YIMEISHI Store, AUTUNEER Tech Store, YQU Store, Shop4368007 Store, careycar store, JuneHome Store, 3074 Car Accessories Store, susulaimi car products Store, Global Electronical Marketing Store, SZ8792 Store, Shop2885192 Store, Snyrobys Store, AutoParts Service Store, jingxiangfeng store, KANUOC Store, Car Nanny Automobile Accessories Store, Chinese welcome light Store, XZ-Car Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, Specify light Store, JUCHI Car Part Store, maite store, Car World Everyday Store, modern car life store, Lavikcar Store, IS Alwaysbest Store, ytd light store, GZ-QGT Store, BrandCar Store, car-life store and Hongy 001 Store
Case Number: 1:2020cv03131
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 107 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #60 in the amount of $200,000 as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
October 29, 2020 Filing 106 MAILED trademark report with certified copy of minute order dated 10/28/2020 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (bg, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed without prejudice, with leave to reinstate within one hundred and twenty (120) days for enforcement of the settlement agreement between the parties. Each party will bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. All pending dates before this court are stricken. Civil case terminated.Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 104 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, racbox worklight store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, and YaLa VIP Store (Gaudio, Justin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 103 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 102 AGREED Asset Restraint Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/16/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint motion for entry of an agreed asset restrain order #99 is granted. Enter Order. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #99 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for Agreed Asset Restraint Order (Joint) (Gaudio, Justin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 98 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store(Curtin, Peter)
October 13, 2020 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 10/13/2020. Motion to strike #83 is granted. Motion for extension of time to answer #94 is granted. Motion for entry of default and default judgment #73 is denied. A joint status report and proposed discovery schedule is due by 10/20/2020. A telephone status hearing is set for 12/21/2020 at 9:00 a.m. To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 11, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Motion by Defendant CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store regarding motion for extension of time to file answer #94 (Curtin, Peter) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/13/2020) (lma, ).
October 11, 2020 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM by Defendant CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store in support of motion for extension of time to file answer #94 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration)(Curtin, Peter) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/13/2020) (lma, ).
October 11, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION by Defendant CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store for extension of time to file answer (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 93 RESPONSE by CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store to MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. to strike MOTION by Defendants CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store, racbox worklight store to vacate preliminary injunction #45 #83 (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 92 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant YaLa VIP Store by Peter James Curtin (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SAHANAK Factory Direct Store by Peter James Curtin (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 90 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant racbox worklight store by Peter James Curtin (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 89 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Enjoynight Autoparts Store by Peter James Curtin (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 88 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store by Peter James Curtin (Curtin, Peter)
October 9, 2020 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #86 is granted. Attorney Peter James Curtin for CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store and racbox worklight store added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17527725. (Curtin, Peter)
October 8, 2020 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The hearing for presentment of motion to strike #83 will be held telephonically.To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion to strike, #83 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. to strike MOTION by Defendants CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store, racbox worklight store to vacate preliminary injunction #45 #81 , answer to complaint #79 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants' motion to vacate preliminary injunction order #81 will be addressed during the telephonic motion hearing previously scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION by Defendants CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store, racbox worklight store to vacate preliminary injunction #45 (Attachments: #1 Supplement MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER, #2 Declaration Declaration of YANG XIANGNING, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Freire, Diego)
October 7, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE by CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store, racbox worklight storein Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Certain DefendantsMOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Certain Defendants #73 (Freire, Diego)
October 7, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint by CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store, racbox worklight store(Freire, Diego)
October 6, 2020 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #73 on 10/13/2020 is reset to 9:00 a.m. To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing set for 10/15/2020 is vacated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #73 on 10/13/2020 is reset from 9:00 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #73 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #73 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Certain Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing set for 10/14/2020 is reset for 10/15/2020 at 9:00 a.m. To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 71 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #60 in the amount of $200,000 (Martin, Allyson)
September 25, 2020 Filing 70 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #60 in the amount of $200,000 as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
September 25, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
September 14, 2020 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone hearing set for 9/15/2020 at 9:30 a.m. is vacated. Telephone status hearing set for 10/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. To join the hearing, please dial 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: In this case brought under the Lanham Act, Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. ("Plaintiff") alleges that China-based AliExpress online marketplace operators CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, racbox worklight store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, and YaLa VIP Store (the "Moving Defendants"), among other defendants, offered for sale, sold and shipped products using counterfeit versions of Plaintiff's trademarks. The Moving Defendants seek dismissal for improper service of process, R. #48 . For the reasons that follow, that motion is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/14/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 66 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #60 in the amount of $200,000 as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
August 27, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY by CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, YaLa VIP Store, racbox worklight store to memorandum in opposition to motion #62 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Shen Wang in Support for Motion to Dismiss)(Freire, Diego)
August 14, 2020 Filing 64 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #60 in the amount of $200,000 as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
August 13, 2020 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in opposition to motion #62 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Gaudio, Justin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss #48 (Gaudio, Justin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #59 is amended as follows: Telephone motion hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment against the Defendants Identified on Schedule A, with the Exception of Certain Defendants #53 . For reasons stated on the record, the motion is granted. Enter Default Judgment against the defendants identified on Schedule A with the exception of Defendants CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, racbox worklight store, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, and YaLa VIP Store. Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 60 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/5/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone motion hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment against the Defendants Identified on Schedule A, with the Exception of Certain Defendants #53 . For reasons stated on the record, the motion is granted. Enter Default Judgment. Telephone hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice is set on 9/15/2020 at 9:30 am. To join the telephone motion hearing, Dial In Number: 877-402-9757; Access Code: 4410831, #.Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
July 28, 2020 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone hearing as to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against the Defendants Identified on Schedule A, with the exception of certain Defendants #53 is set on 8/5/2020 at 9:30 a.m. To join the telephone hearing, dial 877-402-9757,Access Code: 4410831.Mailed notice (sxw, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Certain DefendantsMOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Certain Defendants #53 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #53 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for entry of default as to Certain Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for default judgment as to Certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to Certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss[48 is due by 8/13/2020. Defendant's reply is due by 8/27/2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 10, 2020 NEW PARTIES: BrandCar Store, Car Accessories A Store, CAR KEY FACTORY, careycar store, car-life store, carmarry store, CarZB Co.,Ltd. Store, Chinese welcome light Store, EXN OFFICIAL STORE, FUWAYDA Official Store, Globale Car & Motor Store, Govi Racing store, HVIERO Official Store, HVIERO VIP Store, jingxiangfeng store, Lavikcar Store, Leites Official Store, Leono Store, maite store, modern car life store, NEWM Nanjing Newsuns Store, pftkjcp company online store, Ronan Official Store, Seineca Store, SZ8792 Store, wy car store, xplus official store, Yanzhiqi Car Styling Trading Co. Ltd.. Store, YY is Car Lights Store, YY xenonlight & LEDlight Store, ZQ car lights Store, 3074 Car Accessories Store, Aozong Car light Store, Autoeaglerich, Automotive lighting fittings Store, AutoParts Service Store, Autor & Motorcycles Store, AUTUNEER Tech Store, Car & Motorcycle Accessories Store, Car Nanny Automobile Accessories Store, Car World Everyday Store, CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store, Chichang lamps Store, Dianacar Store, DXZ Car-Parts Store, Enjoynight Autoparts Store, gaowu car products store, Global Electronical Marketing Store, GZ-QGT Store, HoneyBaby Store, Hongy 001 Store, HTPOW Car Accessories Store, HX-CarLight Store, IS Alwaysbest Store, J&F Imp & Exp, JUCHI Car Part Store, JuneHome Store, KANUOC Store, LB Flyying Car Store, pilot e store, racbox worklight store, Running Cars, SAHANAK Factory Direct Store, Shop2885192 Store, Shop4368007 Store, Shop4687086 Store, Shop5009127 Store, Shop5075353 Store, Shop5134082 Store, Shop5573145 Store, Shop831232 Store, SL Store, Snyrobys Store, Specify light Store, SUNG Auto Lighting & Electronics, superwind car Store, susulaimi car products Store, The Car Factory Store, XZ-Car Store, YaLa VIP Store, yesplease store, YIMEISHI Store, YQU Store, ytd light store, zexuanlin1982 Store and zhengsheng store added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy)
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Shen Wang (Wang, Shen)
July 10, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION by Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" to dismiss (Freire, Diego)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Diego Fernando Freire (Freire, Diego)
July 9, 2020 Filing 45 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/9/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is granted. #38 Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #2 , the Amended Complaint #12 and Exhibit 1 [12-1], Exhibit 2 [12-2], Exhibit 3 [12-3], and Exhibit 4 [12-4], thereto, Schedule A to the Complaint #3 and the Amended Complaint [12-5], Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order #13 , Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order #14 , the Declaration of Dana A. Cizmadia #16 and Exhibit 1 [16-1], Exhibit 2 [16-2] and Exhibit 3 #17 thereto, the Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio #15 and Exhibit 1 [15-1], Exhibit 2 [15-2], Exhibit 3 [15-3], and Exhibit 4 [15-4] thereto, Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #18 , Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #19 , the Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio #20 and Exhibit 1 [20-1 and Exhibit 2 [20-2] thereto, Plaintiff's Notification of Affiliates #22 , Plaintiff's Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks #23 , and the TRO #25 are unsealed. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/9/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Wei Yang Yang, Wei (Yang, Wei)
June 24, 2020 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Any objections to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #38 are due by 7/8/2020. Absent any objections this Court will rule on the motion on 7/9/2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner)(Juettner, Thomas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for preliminary injunction #38 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #38 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
June 23, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
June 23, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
June 23, 2020 NEW PARTIES: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. added to case caption. Terminating ABC Corporation (Gaudio, Justin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by He Cheng (Cheng, He)
June 21, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Tao Liu Liu, Tao (Liu, Tao)
June 19, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by He Cheng (Cheng, He)
June 19, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Tao Liu Liu, Tao (Liu, Tao)
June 11, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A". (ng, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 29 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #26 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by ABC Corporation re MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order #26 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by ABC Corporation in support of extension of time #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
June 1, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/1/2020. (sxb, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery, and Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) are granted. #13 #18 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal is granted. #9 Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff shall deposit with the Court ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00), either cash or surety bond, as security, which amount was determined adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of a wrongful restraint hereunder, such bond to be deposited with the Court once in-person civil case hearings resume. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/1/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Notification of Affiliates Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by ABC Corporation re SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery #13 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Electronic Process of Service Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #18 , MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for leave to file under seal #9 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio regarding #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Electronic Process of Service Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-7 regarding sealed document #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 3-5, #6 Exhibit 3-6, #7 Exhibit 3-7)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Declaration of Plaintiff's Representative Regarding #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio regarding #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
May 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ABC Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17057678. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Represented By: He Cheng
Represented By: Tao Liu
Represented By: Wei Yang
Represented By: Diego Fernando Freire
Represented By: Shen Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVIERO VIP Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarZB Co.,Ltd. Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YaLa VIP Store
Represented By: Diego Fernando Freire
Represented By: Peter James Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhengsheng store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanzhiqi Car Styling Trading Co. Ltd.. Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leono Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZQ car lights Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5009127 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUWAYDA Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Govi Racing store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&F Imp & Exp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Accessories A Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: carmarry store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop831232 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5134082 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zexuanlin1982 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAHANAK Factory Direct Store
Represented By: Diego Fernando Freire
Represented By: Peter James Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aozong Car light Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5573145 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: racbox worklight store
Represented By: Diego Fernando Freire
Represented By: Peter James Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronan Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTPOW Car Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: superwind car Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chichang lamps Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pilot e store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car & Motorcycle Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autor & Motorcycles Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXN OFFICIAL STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HoneyBaby Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4687086 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXZ Car-Parts Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNG Auto Lighting & Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gaowu car products store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWM Nanjing Newsuns Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YY is Car Lights Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Car Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive lighting fittings Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seineca Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xplus official store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leites Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLitek CARLitek VIP Store
Represented By: Diego Fernando Freire
Represented By: Peter James Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YY xenonlight & LEDlight Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yesplease store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAR KEY FACTORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pftkjcp company online store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wy car store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianacar Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globale Car & Motor Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LB Flyying Car Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5075353 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVIERO Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Running Cars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoeaglerich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HX-CarLight Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YIMEISHI Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTUNEER Tech Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YQU Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4368007 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: careycar store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JuneHome Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3074 Car Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: susulaimi car products Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Electronical Marketing Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SZ8792 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop2885192 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyrobys Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoParts Service Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jingxiangfeng store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANUOC Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Nanny Automobile Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinese welcome light Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XZ-Car Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enjoynight Autoparts Store
Represented By: Diego Fernando Freire
Represented By: Peter James Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specify light Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUCHI Car Part Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maite store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car World Everyday Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: modern car life store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavikcar Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IS Alwaysbest Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ytd light store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GZ-QGT Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrandCar Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: car-life store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hongy 001 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Corporation
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?