Philpot v. Vivid Seats LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Vivid Seats LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03198
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the joint status report #9 filed on 7/14/2020, the status hearing set for 7/17/2020 is stricken and reset to 8/12/2020 at 9:00 a.m. A revised status report is due no later than 8/7/2020. The 8/12/2020 status hearing will be telephonic. Participants are to use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report by Larry G. Philpot (Zlatkin, Ilya)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 17, 2020 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (The paper copy of document #6 was delayed for mailing. The Clerk did not mail the document until June 17, 2020.) (ph, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/17/2020 at 9:10 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ph, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
June 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot by Ilya Zlatkin (Zlatkin, Ilya)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zlatkin, Ilya)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Larry G. Philpot; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17065915. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Nugent Photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Reg - Nugent Photo, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Wikimedia-Nugent, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - REO Photo, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Copyright Reg - REO Photo, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Wikimedia-REO, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Creative Commons License, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Infringement of Nugent Photo, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Infringement of REO Photo)(Zlatkin, Ilya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Vivid Seats LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Ilya Zlatkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivid Seats LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?