Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc.
Defendant: American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03224
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 8/1/2020. Written discovery requests shall be served by 9/1/2020. Fact discovery shall be completed by 1/31/2021. Motions to amend the pleadings or add new parties shall be filed by 11/1/2020. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 4/1/2021. The telephonic status hearing set for 7/8/2020 #25 is stricken and re-set for 9/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. By 9/9/2020, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing: (1) what fact discovery has been completed; (2) what fact discovery remains to be taken; (3) whether the parties anticipate any obstacles to meeting the deadlines set forth in this order; and (4) whether the parties would like to keep the 9/16/2020 status hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. (Neel, Preston)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Telephonic hearing scheduled for 7/8/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 877-336-1828 and the access code is 4082461. Counsel of record will receive an email prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice.(jlj)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. by Punit Kumar Marwaha (Marwaha, Punit)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants re answer to complaint #27 (McGuire, Michael) (Linked document displays incorrect case number) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bg, ).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by All Defendants re answer to complaint #27 (McGuire, Michael) (Linked document displays incorrect case number) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bg, ).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defense by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Complaint)(McGuire, Michael) (Linked document displays incorrect case number) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bg, ).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. by Preston Hunter Neel Designation of Local Counsel (Neel, Preston)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for order #23 is granted. By agreement, Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by 6/17/2020. The parties need not file a status report by 6/19/2020. The status hearing set for 6/25/2020 #20 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 7/8/2020 at 9:15 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 7/1/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation by Michael J. McGuire (McGuire, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. for order re Stipulation regarding Response Date (Neel, Preston)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION Regarding Answer Date (Neel, Preston)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. by Preston Hunter Neel (Neel, Preston)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties are reminded of the requirements of Local Rule 83.15 and are cautioned that compliance therewith is required.Initial status hearing set for 6/25/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 6/19/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Correction regarding #17 (sxb, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Entered in Error. (bg, ) Modified on 6/3/2020 (sxb, ).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RECEIVED from Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01072 (bg)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Dismiss Or Alternatively, Motion To Transfer Venue and Memorandum In Support Thereof. Case transferred to Eastern Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re: #12 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Neel, Preston) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Or Alternatively, Motion To Transfer Venue and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit License Information, #2 Exhibit License Disclaimer)(Neel, Preston) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. (bg, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Or Alternatively, Motion To Transfer Venue and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed.(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Or Alternatively, Motion To Transfer Venue and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed.(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Or Alternatively, Motion To Transfer Venue and Memorandum In Support Thereof by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION re: Answer Date by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc., filed.(Neel, Preston) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferOlson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(olindoradi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Not Issued as to docket entry #2 American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Neel, Preston) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Neel, Preston) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24475554) filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Settlement Stmt., #2 Exhibit Ex. B Loan Purchase Agreement)(Neel, Preston) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Michael L Jones
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Preston Hunter Neel
Represented By: Punit Kumar Marwaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?