Wincek et al v. Veal et al
Plaintiff: Irina Ivanova-Wincek and Bob Wincek
Defendant: Arthur V. Veal, IV, Chicago Title and Trust Company, not individually but as Trustee of the land trust dated and known by Trust No. 8002348216, True Numbers, LLC and We Buy Houses Home Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03296
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by August 28, 2020. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
June 17, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Title and Trust Company, True Numbers, LLC, Arthur V. Veal, IV, We Buy Houses Home Services, LLC (dxb, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Irina Ivanova-Wincek, Bob Wincek by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Weissberg, Ariel)
June 4, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bob Wincek, Irina Ivanova-Wincek; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17079602. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Weissberg, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wincek et al v. Veal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Ivanova-Wincek
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Wincek
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur V. Veal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title and Trust Company, not individually but as Trustee of the land trust dated and known by Trust No. 8002348216
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Numbers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Buy Houses Home Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?