United States of America v. Rivers et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Patricia Rivers, Alpha II Omega Tax and Ki'esha M. Gary
Case Number: 1:2020cv03313
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the answer deadline of 08/04/2020, the status hearing of 07/23/2020 is reset to 08/21/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 08/12/2020. Emailed notice (mw, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America. Ki'esha M. Gary waiver sent on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Jones, Samuel)
June 28, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/23/2020 at 9:30 a.m. If held, the initial status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1:00 p.m. on the prior business day. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 07/14/2020. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Samuel Patrick Jones (Jones, Samuel)
June 4, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Jordan Andrew Konig (Konig, Jordan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Konig, Jordan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Konig, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rivers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha II Omega Tax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ki'esha M. Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jordan Andrew Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?