Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Adams-Winterfield & Sullivan Funeral Home, P.C.
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund and Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund
Defendant: Adams-Winterfield & Sullivan Funeral Home, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03331
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund by Jonathan Capistran Magna (Magna, Jonathan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund (Miller, Richard)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Attached is an outline for the initial joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 7/30/2020. (rao, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Adams-Winterfield & Sullivan Funeral Home, P.C. (Holleb, Joshua)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund as to All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Richard)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund regarding Summons & Complaint served on Terrence M. Sullivan on 6/25/2020 (Miller, Richard)
June 9, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Adams-Winterfield & Sullivan Funeral Home, P.C. (dxb, )
June 5, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, Richard)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund, Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17085048. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Miller, Richard)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Adams-Winterfield & Sullivan Funeral Home, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams-Winterfield & Sullivan Funeral Home, P.C.
Represented By: Joshua David Holleb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Richard Lane Miller, II
Represented By: Jonathan Capistran Magna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Legal and Educational Assistance Fund
Represented By: Richard Lane Miller, II
Represented By: Jonathan Capistran Magna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 727 Pension Fund
Represented By: Richard Lane Miller, II
Represented By: Jonathan Capistran Magna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?