Barkins v. Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Joel Barkins
Defendant: Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Camber Pharmacuticals, Inc. and Hetero USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03398
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 1:20-cv-08528, filed 07/09/2020. (bg, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the District of New Jersey the electronic record. (gcy, )
July 6, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2875 Conditional Transfer Order filed 7/6/20. (gcy, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to District of New Jersey. (gcy, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
June 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. by Paul Evans Chronis (Chronis, Paul)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. by Keith M St. Aubin (St. Aubin, Keith)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (St. Aubin, Keith)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants re notice of removal, #1 (St. Aubin, Keith)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020L005552) filed by Huahai US, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17094917. Exhibit A Complaint; Exhibit B Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(St. Aubin, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkins v. Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huahai US, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M St. Aubin
Represented By: Paul Evans Chronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M St. Aubin
Represented By: Paul Evans Chronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare US, LLC
Represented By: Keith M St. Aubin
Represented By: Paul Evans Chronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang HuaHai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Keith M St. Aubin
Represented By: Paul Evans Chronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camber Pharmacuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Barkins
Represented By: John J Macinerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?