Bentrup v. Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amber Bentrup
Defendant: Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03413
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed extension motion to file status report #9 is granted to 08/14/2020, in light of the 08/10/2020 answer deadline. The status hearing of 07/23/2020 is reset to 08/21/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will review the status report and set the discovery schedule. Emailed notice (mw, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Barry A. Hartstein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #9 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/13/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Hartstein, Barry)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. for extension of time to file Joint Status Report (Unopposed) (Hartstein, Barry)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. (Hartstein, Barry)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. by Daniel Young Keun Kim (Kim, Daniel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. by Barry A. Hartstein (Hartstein, Barry)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amber Bentrup. Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Martoccio, Gary)
June 28, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/23/2020 at 9:15 a.m. If held, the initial status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1:00 p.m. on the prior business day. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 07/14/2020. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
June 11, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Willis, Gia)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Bentrup by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Amber Bentrup; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17099049. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentrup v. Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Bentrup
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Young Keun Kim
Represented By: Barry A. Hartstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?