Allison v. Paratech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jermaine Allison
Defendant: Paratech, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03414
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Paratech, Inc. by Jennifer Adams Murphy (Murphy, Jennifer)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jermaine Allison. Paratech, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Martoccio, Gary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 8/27/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
June 11, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Pease, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jermaine Allison by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Jermaine Allison; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17099280. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison v. Paratech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Allison
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paratech, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Adams Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?