Pickens v. Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Pickens
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Sekurit, Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz, Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. and Mercedes Benz USA LLC
Petitioner: Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03470
Filed: June 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation by James H. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File its Responsive Pleading #20 is granted. Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation to file its response to the amended complaint by 9/18/2020.Mailed notice (sxw, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Movant Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation for extension of time to file responsive pleading (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Myers, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation by Brian H Myers (Myers, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone conference held on Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. for extension of time to file responsive pleading #8 . For reasons stated on the record, the motion is granted. Additionally, Counsel for Mercedes Benz USA LLC's oral request to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendants Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. and Mercedes Benz USA LLC to respond to the complaint by 9/18/2020. By 9/16/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report. The 8/24/2020 date for status report is stricken. Telephone status is set on 9/18/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel is to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831.Mailed notice (sxw, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce Pickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce Pickens as to Mercedes Benz USA LLC on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Saint-Gobain Sekurit regarding Complaint and Summons served on Kamesha James on 7/14/2020, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce Pickens as to Saint-Gobain Sekurit on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. by Daniel C Cox (Cox, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Bruce Pickensin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleading #8 (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. by Christopher M. Hohn (Hohn, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephonic motion hearing on defendant's motion for extension of time #8 is set for 7/24/2020 at 11:00 AM. Counsel is to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 21, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz. (gw, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED complaint by Bruce Pickens against Bruce Pickens (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Maudia Diana Victorian Norman Washington of Change of Address (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mariotti, Renato)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. by Holly Hannah Campbell (Campbell, Holly)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. by Renato T. Mariotti (Mariotti, Renato)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:A joint status report is to be filed by 8/24/2020. Instructions for the status report may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bruce Pickens regarding Complaint and Summons on 6/29/2020 (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Bruce Pickens regarding Complaint and Summons served on Beverly Brooks on 6/23/2020 (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 7, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Saint-Gobain Sekurit. (jg, )
June 29, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc.. (gw, )
June 26, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc. (acm, )
June 15, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz, Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc., Saint-Gobain Sekurit (dxb, )
June 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Pease, Michael)
June 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bruce Pickens; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17106390. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Norman Washington, Maudia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickens v. Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Sekurit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napleton Autowerks of Indiana, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Renato T. Mariotti
Represented By: Daniel C Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Pickens
Represented By: Maudia Diana Victorian Norman Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saint-Gobain Glass Corporation
Represented By: Brian H Myers
Represented By: James H. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?