Johnson & Johnson et al v. Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon US, LLC and Ethicon, Inc.
Defendant: Mike Phipps, Mudassar Shah, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr., Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn and Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. doing business as Esutures.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv03471
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Referring Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 224 OBJECTIONS by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to order on motion to quash,, order on motion to compel,, text entry, #212 , memorandum opinion and order #213 Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge Cummings's Order Denying Defendants' Motion To Quash Third Party Subpoenas (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 25, 2020 Filing 223 NOTICE by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps re memorandum, #221 Defendants' Notice of Filing Re-Formatted Versions of Exs 2, 18, 23, 24 and 25 to Defs Supplemental Mem of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 25, 2020 Filing 222 Amended Notice of Emergency Motion NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion to stay, #214 before Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 9/1/2020 at 10:00 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 24, 2020 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM evidentiary hearing,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, #209 by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Confirmation Of The Ex Parte Seizure Order And To Plaintiffs' Request For Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3-12, #4 Exhibit 13-27)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 24, 2020 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM evidentiary hearing,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, #209 by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Suppress and to Increase the Seizure Bond (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 24, 2020 Filing 219 RESPONSE by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike PhippsDefendants' Motion To Keep Portions Of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Under Seal That Reference The Exhibits That Are Subject To Defendants' #210 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 24, 2020 Filing 218 RESPONSE by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to stay regarding order on motion to quash,, order on motion to compel,, text entry, #212 , memorandum opinion and order #213 Defendants' Emergency Motion To S #214 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Judge Cummings' Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Quash (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 24, 2020 Filing 217 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion to keep portions of Plaintiff's reply brief under seal #210 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' response is due by 8/28/2020; Defendants' reply is due by 9/4/2020. Notice of motion date of 8/28/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. As counsel are aware, the standard for maintaining matters under seal in the Seventh Circuit is very high. Nevertheless, the parties are directed to err on the side of keeping the matters subject to this motion sealed until the Court has an opportunity to issue a ruling on this motion, which will then determine whether Defendants have a right to keep them under seal longer (either until the motion to suppress is ruled on, or potentially indefinitely if some or all of the documents are suppressed.). Defendants' emergency motion to stay Magistrate Judge Cummings' August 20 Order #214 should be presented to Magistrate Judge Cummings, as the issuing judge, in the first instance. If Judge Cummings denies the stay motion, Defendants may promptly renew the motion before Judge Dow. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 216 Plaintiffs' Update Concerning Testing and Sampling of Seized Product in Response to the Court's July 27, 2020 Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 21, 2020 Filing 215 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 21, 2020 Filing 214 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to stay regarding order on motion to quash,, order on motion to compel,, text entry, #212 , memorandum opinion and order #213 Defendants' Emergency Motion To Stay Magistrate Judge Cumming's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Quash Until The District Court Resolves Defendants' Soon To Be Filed Objection (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 20, 2020 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 8/20/2020. Mailed notice (cc, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: For reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. d/b/a eSutures.com and Anthony Iaderosa, Jr.'s amended and supplemented motion to quash the subpoenas to produce documents that plaintiffs directed to third-parties Lakeside Bank, CitiMortgage, Inc., and J.P. Morgan Chase Bank #69 is denied. Mailed notice (cc, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 211 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #210 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/28/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 20, 2020 Filing 210 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike PhippsDefendants' Motion To Keep Portions Of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Under Seal That Reference The Exhibits That Are Subject To Defendants' Pending Motion to Supress (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 14, 2020 Filing 209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Hearing held on pending motions. Supplemental briefing ordered as follows: Defendants' supplemental brief of no more than 40 pages is due by 8/24/2020 and is to cover sur-reply on motion for preliminary injunction, response on material differences issues and response on Daubert motion; Plaintiffs' supplemental brief of no more than 20 pages is due by 8/24/2020 and is to cover response on motion to suppress and response on motion to increase bond; Defendants' supplemental brief of no more than 20 pages is due by 9/3/2020 and is to cover replies on motion to suppress and motion to increase bond; Plaintiffs' supplemental brief of no more than 40 pages is due by 9/3/2020 and is to cover sur-sur-reply on motion for preliminary injunction and replies on material differences issues and reply on Daubert motion. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 208 Plaintiffs' Update Concerning Testing and Sampling of Seized Product in Response to the Court's July 27, 2020 Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 13, 2020 Filing 207 JOINT PROPOSAL FOR ADDRESSING MATERIAL-DIFFERENCES CLAIMS by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 12, 2020 Filing 206 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Regarding this matter set for a hearing by video conference scheduled for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 571-353-2300 and the call-in ID is 472853588. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (cdh, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 8/12/2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 204 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. by Joshua Reuben Stein (Stein, Joshua)
August 12, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #201 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 12, 2020 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #201 Motion To Suppress Evidence Seized In Violation Of Defendants' Constitutional Rights (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1 - 7)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 12, 2020 Filing 201 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps To Suppress Evidence Seized In Violation Of Defendants' Constitutional Rights (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 12, 2020 Filing 200 RESPONSE by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to strike sealed document, #176 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply Brief and Exhibit A #198 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Briefing in Support of Preliminary Injunction and Confirmation of the Seizure (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 11, 2020 Filing 199 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion to strike, #198 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 11, 2020 Filing 198 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to strike sealed document, #176 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply Brief and Exhibit A (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 11, 2020 Filing 197 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Exhibit 171 to the Potter Declaration, regarding sealed document,,,,,,,,,, #181 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 173 to the Potter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 174 to the Potter Declaration, #3 Exhibit 175 to the Potter Declaration, #4 Exhibit 176 to the Potter Declaration, #5 Exhibit 177 to the Potter Declaration, #6 Exhibit 178 to the Potter Declaration, #7 Exhibit 179 to the Potter Declaration, #8 Exhibit 180 to the Potter Declaration, #9 Exhibit 181 to the Potter Declaration, #10 Exhibit 182 to the Potter Declaration, #11 Exhibit 183 to the Potter Declaration, #12 Exhibit 184 to the Potter Declaration, #13 Exhibit 187 to the Potter Declaration, #14 Exhibit 188 to the Potter Declaration, #15 Exhibit 189 to the Potter Declaration, #16 Exhibit 190 to the Potter Declaration, #17 Exhibit 191 to the Potter Declaration, #18 Exhibit 192 to the Potter Declaration, #19 Exhibit 194 to the Potter Declaration, #20 Exhibit 195 to the Potter Declaration, #21 Exhibit 196 to the Potter Declaration, #22 Exhibit 197 to the Potter Declaration, #23 Exhibit 198 to the Potter Declaration, #24 Exhibit 199 to the Potter Declaration, #25 Exhibit 200 to the Potter Declaration, #26 Exhibit 201 to the Potter Declaration, #27 Exhibit 202 to the Potter Declaration, #28 Exhibit 203 to the Potter Declaration, #29 Exhibit 204 to the Potter Declaration, #30 Exhibit 205 to the Potter Declaration, #31 Exhibit 206 to the Potter Declaration, #32 Exhibit 207 to the Potter Declaration, #33 Exhibit 208 to the Potter Declaration, #34 Exhibit 209 to the Potter Declaration, #35 Exhibit 210 to the Potter Declaration, #36 Exhibit 211 to the Potter Declaration, #37 Exhibit 212 to the Potter Declaration, #38 Exhibit 213 to the Potter Declaration, #39 Exhibit 215 to the Potter Declaration, #40 Exhibit 216 to the Potter Declaration, #41 Exhibit 217 to the Potter Declaration, #42 Exhibit 218 to the Potter Declaration, #43 Exhibit 219 to the Potter Declaration, #44 Exhibit 221 to the Potter Declaration, #45 Exhibit 222 to the Potter Declaration, #46 Exhibit 224 to the Potter Declaration, #47 Exhibit 225 to the Potter Declaration, #48 Exhibit 226 to the Potter Declaration, #49 Exhibit 227 to the Potter Declaration, #50 Exhibit 228 to the Potter Declaration, #51 Exhibit 229 to the Potter Declaration, #52 Exhibit 230 to the Potter Declaration, #53 Exhibit 231 to the Potter Declaration, #54 Exhibit 232 to the Potter Declaration, #55 Exhibit 233 to the Potter Declaration, #56 Exhibit 234 to the Potter Declaration, #57 Exhibit 235 to the Potter Declaration, #58 Exhibit 236 to the Potter Declaration, #59 Exhibit 237 to the Potter Declaration)(Potter, Geoffrey)
August 11, 2020 Filing 196 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Preclude the Expert Testimony of J. Lester Alexander Under Fed. R. Evid. 702 (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 11, 2020 Filing 195 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.Motion to Preclude the Expert Testimony of J. Lester Alexander Under Fed. R. Evid. 702 (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 194 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Exhibit 109 to the Potter Declaration, regarding sealed document,,,,,,,,,, #181 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110 to the Potter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 111 to the Potter Declaration, #3 Exhibit 112 to the Potter Declaration, #4 Exhibit 113 to the Potter Declaration, #5 Exhibit 114 to the Potter Declaration, #6 Exhibit 115 to the Potter Declaration, #7 Exhibit 116 to the Potter Declaration, #8 Exhibit 117 to the Potter Declaration, #9 Exhibit 118 to the Potter Declaration, #10 Exhibit 121 to the Potter Declaration, #11 Exhibit 122 to the Potter Declaration, #12 Exhibit 123 to the Potter Declaration, #13 Exhibit 127 to the Potter Declaration, #14 Exhibit 129 to the Potter Declaration, #15 Exhibit 130 to the Potter Declaration, #16 Exhibit 131 to the Potter Declaration, #17 Exhibit 132 to the Potter Declaration, #18 Exhibit 133 to the Potter Declaration, #19 Exhibit 134 to the Potter Declaration, #20 Exhibit 135 to the Potter Declaration, #21 Exhibit 136 to the Potter Declaration, #22 Exhibit 137 to the Potter Declaration, #23 Exhibit 138 to the Potter Declaration, #24 Exhibit 139 to the Potter Declaration, #25 Exhibit 140 to the Potter Declaration, #26 Exhibit 141 to the Potter Declaration, #27 Exhibit 142 to the Potter Declaration, #28 Exhibit 143 to the Potter Declaration, #29 Exhibit 144 to the Potter Declaration, #30 Exhibit 145 to the Potter Declaration, #31 Exhibit 146 to the Potter Declaration, #32 Exhibit 147 to the Potter Declaration, #33 Exhibit 148 to the Potter Declaration, #34 Exhibit 149 to the Potter Declaration, #35 Exhibit 150 to the Potter Declaration, #36 Exhibit 151 to the Potter Declaration, #37 Exhibit 152 to the Potter Declaration, #38 Exhibit 153 to the Potter Declaration, #39 Exhibit 154 to the Potter Declaration, #40 Exhibit 157 to the Potter Declaration, #41 Exhibit 158 to the Potter Declaration, #42 Exhibit 159 to the Potter Declaration, #43 Exhibit 161 to the Potter Declaration, #44 Exhibit 162 to the Potter Declaration, #45 Exhibit 163 to the Potter Declaration, #46 Exhibit 164 to the Potter Declaration, #47 Exhibit 165 to the Potter Declaration, #48 Exhibit 166 to the Potter Declaration, #49 Exhibit 167 to the Potter Declaration, #50 Exhibit 168 to the Potter Declaration, #51 Exhibit 169 to the Potter Declaration)(Potter, Geoffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 193 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Daniel Burkley, July 30, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 192 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Diana Harbach, August 10, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 191 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Daniel Burkley, August 7, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 190 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Exhibit 54 to the Potter Declaration regarding sealed document,,,,,,,,,, #181 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55 to the Potter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 56 to the Potter Declaration, #3 Exhibit 57 to the Potter Declaration, #4 Exhibit 58 to the Potter Declaration, #5 Exhibit 59 to the Potter Declaration, #6 Exhibit 60 to the Potter Declaration, #7 Exhibit 61 to the Potter Declaration, #8 Exhibit 62 to the Potter Declaration, #9 Exhibit 63 to the Potter Declaration, #10 Exhibit 64 to the Potter Declaration, #11 Exhibit 65 to the Potter Declaration, #12 Exhibit 66 to the Potter Declaration, #13 Exhibit 67 to the Potter Declaration, #14 Exhibit 68 to the Potter Declaration, #15 Exhibit 69 to the Potter Declaration, #16 Exhibit 70 to the Potter Declaration, #17 Exhibit 71 to the Potter Declaration, #18 Exhibit 72 to the Potter Declaration, #19 Exhibit 73 to the Potter Declaration, #20 Exhibit 74 to the Potter Declaration, #21 Exhibit 75 to the Potter Declaration, #22 Exhibit 76 to the Potter Declaration, #23 Exhibit 77 to the Potter Declaration, #24 Exhibit 78 to the Potter Declaration, #25 Exhibit 79 to the Potter Declaration, #26 Exhibit 80 to the Potter Declaration, #27 Exhibit 81 to the Potter Declaration, #28 Exhibit 82 to the Potter Declaration, #29 Exhibit 83 to the Potter Declaration, #30 Exhibit 84 to the Potter Declaration, #31 Exhibit 85 to the Potter Declaration, #32 Exhibit 86 to the Potter Declaration, #33 Exhibit 87 to the Potter Declaration, #34 Exhibit 88 to the Potter Declaration, #35 Exhibit 89 to the Potter Declaration, #36 Exhibit 90 to the Potter Declaration, #37 Exhibit 91 to the Potter Declaration, #38 Exhibit 92 to the Potter Declaration, #39 Exhibit 93 to the Potter Declaration, #40 Exhibit 94 to the Potter Declaration, #41 Exhibit 95 to the Potter Declaration, #42 Exhibit 96 to the Potter Declaration, #43 Exhibit 97 to the Potter Declaration, #44 Exhibit 100 to the Potter Declaration, #45 Exhibit 101 to the Potter Declaration, #46 Exhibit 102 to the Potter Declaration, #47 Exhibit 105 to the Potter Declaration, #48 Exhibit 106 to the Potter Declaration, #49 Exhibit 107 to the Potter Declaration, #50 Exhibit 108 to the Potter Declaration)(Potter, Geoffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 189 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Vikram Masson, August 6, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 188 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Reynaldo Librojo, August 10, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 187 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Lisa Silverman, August 8, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 186 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Carla Zapata, August 9, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 185 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. John Webb, August 6, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 184 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Patricia Toth, August 8, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 183 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Joshua R. Stein, August 8, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 182 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Patricia Toth, August 9, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 181 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Geoffrey Potter, August 10, 2020 Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to the Potter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 4 to the Potter Declaration, #3 Exhibit 5 to the Potter Declaration, #4 Exhibit 6 to the Potter Declaration, #5 Exhibit 8 to the Potter Declaration, #6 Exhibit 9 to the Potter Declaration, #7 Exhibit 10 to the Potter Declaration, #8 Exhibit 11 to the Potter Declaration, #9 Exhibit 12 to the Potter Declaration, #10 Exhibit 13 to the Potter Declaration, #11 Exhibit 14 to the Potter Declaration, #12 Exhibit 15 to the Potter Declaration, #13 Exhibit 16 to the Potter Declaration, #14 Exhibit 17 to the Potter Declaration, #15 Exhibit 18 to the Potter Declaration, #16 Exhibit 19 to the Potter Declaration, #17 Exhibit 20 to the Potter Declaration, #18 Exhibit 21 to the Potter Declaration, #19 Exhibit 22 to the Potter Declaration, #20 Exhibit 23 to the Potter Declaration, #21 Exhibit 24 to the Potter Declaration, #22 Exhibit 25 to the Potter Declaration, #23 Exhibit 26 to the Potter Declaration, #24 Exhibit 27 to the Potter Declaration, #25 Exhibit 28 to the Potter Declaration, #26 Exhibit 29 to the Potter Declaration, #27 Exhibit 30 to the Potter Declaration, #28 Exhibit 31 to the Potter Declaration, #29 Exhibit 32 to the Potter Declaration, #30 Exhibit 33 to the Potter Declaration, #31 Exhibit 34 to the Potter Declaration, #32 Exhibit 35 to the Potter Declaration, #33 Exhibit 36 to the Potter Declaration, #34 Exhibit 37 to the Potter Declaration, #35 Exhibit 38 to the Potter Declaration, #36 Exhibit 39 to the Potter Declaration, #37 Exhibit 40 to the Potter Declaration, #38 Exhibit 41 to the Potter Declaration, #39 Exhibit 42 to the Potter Declaration, #40 Exhibit 43 to the Potter Declaration, #41 Exhibit 44 to the Potter Declaration, #42 Exhibit 45 to the Potter Declaration, #43 Exhibit 46 to the Potter Declaration, #44 Exhibit 47 to the Potter Declaration, #45 Exhibit 48 to the Potter Declaration, #46 Exhibit 49 to the Potter Declaration, #47 Exhibit 50 to the Potter Declaration, #48 Exhibit 51 to the Potter Declaration, #49 Exhibit 52 to the Potter Declaration, #50 Exhibit 53 to the Potter Declaration)(Potter, Geoffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 180 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Diana Harbach, July 28, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 179 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Hannah Coleman, August 10, 2020 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 178 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Local Rule Page Limitation (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 177 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal document sealed document, #176 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Reply Memorandum and Daubert Motion (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 176 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Request for a Preliminary Injunction and to Confirm the Ex Parte Seizure Order (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 175 RESPONSE by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to strike Defendants' Motion to Strike Declarations of Geoffrey Potter #157 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Declarations of Geoffrey Potter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 8, 2020 Filing 174 Joint Proposal For Format of August 14, 2020 Hearing by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 7, 2020 Filing 173 Plaintiffs' Update Concerning Testing and Sampling of Seized Product in Response to the Court's July 27, 2020 Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 7, 2020 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM order on motion for order, order on motion for temporary restraining order, #29 , order #31 by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Confirmation of Seizure Order and Entry of Preliminary Injunction (This is the Public, Redacted Version of the Documents Previously Filed Under Seal, See Dkt. Nos. 161-163) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5-8, #7 Exhibit 9-26)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 5, 2020 Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: This order addresses several housekeeping matters relating to docket control. Defendants' motion to quash #69 is referred to Magistrate Judge Cummings for disposition as it relates to other matters that he has been handling with the parties. Plaintiffs' motion to seal document #124 , Plaintiffs' motion to seal first amended complaint #155 , Defendants' motion to file under seal #158 , Defendants' motion to file a brief with excess pages #159 , Defendants' motion to late file exhibits #164 , Plaintiffs' motion to extend time to respond to Defendants' counterclaims #168 , and Defendants' motion to extend time to answer amended complaint #169 are granted. Defendants' motion to strike Potter declarations #157 is taken under advisement; Plaintiffs may respond to that motion as part of their reply brief due on 8/10/2020. Notice of motion date of 8/11/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. This matter remains set for a preliminary injunction hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Consistent with the guidance from the CDC, state and local authorities, and the Court's own Fifth Amended General Order, and given the number of counsel who live out of state and may be subject to various quarantine orders should they travel to Chicago, the hearing will take place telephonically using the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Counsel should give careful attention to whether certain factual issues can be presented by stipulation or through affidavits. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 170 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of extension of time #169 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/11/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 4, 2020 Filing 169 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps for extension of time Defendants' Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Answer Amended Complaint (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 4, 2020 Filing 168 MOTION by Counter Defendants Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc., Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. for extension of time Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims (Andreozzi, Bradley)
August 3, 2020 Filing 167 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Document not imaged))(td, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 166 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Mr. Iaderosa, Mr. Einhorn, and Mr. Phipps by Michael S Denniston (Denniston, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/4/2020) (pj, ).
August 1, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 1, 2020 Filing 164 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike PhippsMotion to Late File Exhibits Due To Technological Issues (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 1, 2020 Filing 163 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps Sealed Exs. 1-4 and 9-26 regarding sealed response #161 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2a, #2 Exhibit 2b, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 9-26)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 1, 2020 Filing 162 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps Exs 5 - 8 to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Confirmation of Seizure Order and Entry of Preliminary Injunction regarding sealed response #161 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 161 SEALED RESPONSE Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Confirmation of Seizure Order and Entry of Preliminary Injunction (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps for leave to file excess pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion to File Brief in Excess of Local Rule 7.1 Page Limitation (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 158 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to seal Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 157 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to strike Defendants' Motion to Strike Declarations of Geoffrey Potter (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 156 Plaintiffs' Update Concerning Testing and Sampling of Seized Product in Response to the Court's July 27, 2020 Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 31, 2020 Filing 155 MOTION by Counter Defendants Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc., Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal document sealed document, #154 , amended complaint, #153 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 31, 2020 Filing 154 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Defendants Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc., Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Unredacted Sealed Version) (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 31, 2020 Filing 153 First AMENDED complaint by Ethicon US, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson against Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps, Mudassar Shah (Redacted Public Record Version) (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 28, 2020 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/27/20 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Order Number: 38845. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-5565. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020. (Mullen, Patrick)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Telephonic conference held on 7/27/20 regarding the status of the testing and sampling of defendants' seized products and plaintiff's emergency cross-motion to compel response to Interrogatory No. 1 concerning defendants' unfrozen assets [#109]. The Court orders as follows. Plaintiffs are ordered to provide defendants with a written update as to the results of their on-going testing of the seized products every second day beginning on 7/28/20. Plaintiffs' written update shall include the information listed in the chart on page 3 of plaintiffs' 7/20/20 memorandum (the "Chart") regarding testing [#145] plus a description of where the tested products were located within defendants' facility immediately prior to the execution of the seizure order and a narrative describing in further detail the results of testing that results in a "confirmed counterfeit" finding. Plaintiffs shall file a weekly update of their Chart with current testing results with the Court beginning on 7/31/20. With respect to the specific seized products that were tested by plaintiffs and determined to be "not counterfeit," plaintiffs are ordered to return to defendants these products pursuant to the terms of the 6/16/20 Seizure Order [#31 at 5] by 7/31/20 or within three business days of the completion of testing, whichever is later. As discussed in open court, a "not counterfeit" finding only applies only to the product or sub-set of products that plaintiffs have tested as indicated in the "Qty Recovered" column of plaintiffs' Chart. Plaintiffs will send to a laboratory selected by defendants a sample of the products with a "confirmed counterfeit" finding so that defendants can perform their own testing. Counsel for the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the laboratories under consideration by defendants with the aim of avoiding future disputes over the capability of the selected laboratory to conduct defendants' desired testing. Plaintiffs' emergency cross-motion to compel response to Interrogatory No. 1 concerning defendants' unfrozen assets, which had previously been denied in part as moot by Judge Dow's 7/20/20 order, is granted in part. For the reasons stated in open court, defendant Anthony Iaderrosa Jr. is ordered to provide a verified answer plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 1 on or before 7/31/20. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 150 Plaintiffs' Update Concerning Testing and Sampling of Seized Product in Response to the Court's July 27, 2020 Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 24, 2020 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Newly Discovered Facts Concerning Defendants' Renewed Motion to Lift the Asset Freeze Order (This is the Public, Redacted Version of a Document Previously Filed Under Seal, See Dkt. No. 123) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION by Counter Defendants Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc., Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to compel Plaintiffs' Emergency Cross-Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 Concerning Defendants' Unfrozen Assets (See Dkt. No. 109) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Second Emergency Motion to Lift Asset Freeze Order (See Dkt. Nos. 90 & 108) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A - 1, #3 Exhibit A - 2, #4 Exhibit A - 3, #5 Exhibit A - 4, #6 Exhibit A - 5, #7 Exhibit A - 6, #8 Exhibit A - 7)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 146 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by Jack Wright Selden (Selden, Jack)
July 20, 2020 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Plaintiffs' Memorandum Concerning Testing and Sampling of Seized Product in Response to Court's July 15, 2020 Order (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 20, 2020 Filing 144 STATUS Report by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sullivan, Erin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 143 REPLY by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to memorandum in opposition to motion, #138 (Nokes, Scarlett)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Renewed Emergency Motion to Lift Asset Freeze Order #90 and Plaintiff's Emergency Cross-Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1Concerning Defendants' Unfrozen Assets #109 . For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' Renewed Motion #90 is denied without prejudice, and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion #109 is denied in part without prejudice as moot (insofar as it relates to the Motion to Lift Asset Freeze Order) and referred to Magistrate Judge Cummings for exploration with counsel and resolution (insofar as itrelates to any other issues of significance leading up to the preliminary injunction hearing). Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/20/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 141 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by Erin Kathleen Sullivan (Sullivan, Erin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 140 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by Gregory Glen Marshall (Marshall, Gregory)
July 17, 2020 Filing 139 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by Scarlett Nokes (Nokes, Scarlett)
July 16, 2020 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. in Opposition to motion to quash #69 (Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Amended and Supplemented Motion to Quash Subpoena) (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 16, 2020 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/15/2020 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Order Number: 38807,38818. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 8/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2020. (Fennell, Kathleen)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to correct exhibit and file under seal #131 is granted. The Court does not anticipate needing a hearing on the motions to lift asset freeze order #90 and cross-motion to compel #109 and will issue a ruling by mail on those motions. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/16/2020. Mailed notice (pj, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Telephonic status hearing regarding the testing and return of defendants' seized inventory was held and is continued until 7/27/20 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a status report on 7/20/20 that describes: (1) the scope of the testing that plaintiffs have performed on defendants' products that are in plaintiffs' custody pursuant to the Seizure Order #31 ("seized products"); (2) the results of the testing that has been performed on the seized products; (3) the nature of the testing that is on-going and anticipated to be performed on the seized products; and (4) the anticipated expense and time that would be required to test a statistically significant random sample of the specified sub-set of the seized products (namely, the 5,564 units of SURGICEL, SURGICEL FIBRILLAR, LIGACLIP, AND ETHICON SECURESTRAP) that were discussed during the status hearing. Defendants are ordered to file a status report on 7/20/20 that identifies: (1) their proposal for the testing of the seized products; (2) what testing, if any, that defendants have conducted on the seized products and the results of any such testing; and (3) what testing, if any, defendants intend to conduct on the seized products. The call-in number for the hearing is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 3997645. Counsel are encouraged to dial in on a landline if at all possible to help prevent the type of technical issues that have plagued the last two hearings. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 134 Advanced Inventory Management and Mike Phipps's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Mike Phipps, Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. against All Plaintiffs . by Mike Phipps, Advanced Inventory Management, Inc.(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 15, 2020 Filing 133 Defendants Anthony Iaderosa and Jason Einhorn's ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 15, 2020 Filing 132 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Corrected Exhibit) regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to amend/correct sealed document, #123 (Motion to Correct Exhibit) andMOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal Exhibit #131 (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 15, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to amend/correct sealed document, #123 (Motion to Correct Exhibit) and, MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 14, 2020 Filing 130 EXHIBIT by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr Ex. C to Defendants' Response To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement Concerning Defendants' Renewed Motion to Lift Asset Freeze regarding Response, #129 (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 14, 2020 Filing 129 RESPONSE by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to sealed document, #123 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement Concerning Defendants' Renewed Motion To Lift Asset Freeze (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 14, 2020 Filing 128 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report in Response to the Court's July 13, 2020 Order) by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 13, 2020 Filing 127 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to order on motion for miscellaneous relief,, terminate motions, set/reset hearings #64 (Memorandum Concerning Testing of Seized Product in Response to the Court's June 25, 2020 Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #2 Exhibit 1-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #3 Exhibit 2-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #4 Exhibit 3-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #5 Exhibit 4-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #6 Exhibit 5-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #7 Exhibit 6-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #8 Exhibit 7-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #9 Exhibit 8-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #10 Exhibit 9-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #11 Exhibit 10-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #12 Exhibit 11-to the Declaration of Geoffrey Potter)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 13, 2020 Filing 126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion to seal document #124 is granted. Defendants are given until 7/14/2020 to file a response to Plaintiffs' supplemental statement #123 . No additional filings will be accepted on Defendants' renewed motion to lift asset freeze order #90 or Plaintiffs' cross-motion #109 , except a joint status report due on 7/14/2020 on any pertinent information learned at the deposition of Defendant Iaderosa if it takes place today as scheduled [see 48]. If the parties cannot agree on what, if anything, to say about that deposition, they may file separate status reports. Finally, in regard to docket management, Plaintiffs' motion for order to show cause why Defendants should not be held in contempt #38 , Defendants' motion to modify #82 , and Defendants' original motion to quash subpoenas #55 are stricken as moot and Defendants' amended and supplemental motion to quash subpoenas #69 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' response to the amended and supplemental motion to quash subpoenas is due by 7/16/2020; Defendants' reply is due by 7/20/2020; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. Notice of motion date of 7/17/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr in Opposition to Sealed motion, #109 Moving Defendants' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Emergency Cross-Motion To Compel (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 12, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal document sealed document, #123 (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 12, 2020 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Supplemental Statement of Newly Discovered Facts Concerning Defendants' Renewed Motion to Lift the Asset Freeze Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 10, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to motion for miscellaneous relief #90 Reply Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 7/10/2020. Upon review of Defendants' emergency motion to clarify scope of expedited discovery #106 and Plaintiffs' response #116 , the order #113 issued on 7/9/2020 is vacated and the following order substituted in its place. The motion to clarify #106 is granted and the clarification is provided below. Mailed notice(cdh, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 120 U.S. MARSHAL AFFIDAVIT of Service regarding Executive Seizure Order served on Advanced lnventory Management, lnc. d/b/a eSutures.com on 6/17/20. (gcy, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 119 U.S. MARSHAL AFFIDAVIT of Service regarding Executive Seizure Order served on Mike Phipps on 6/17/20. (gcy, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 118 U.S. MARSHAL AFFIDAVIT of Service regarding Executive Seizure Order served on Jason Einhorn on 6/17/20. (gcy, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Clarify the Scope of Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Morrissey, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: It has come to the Court's attention that counsel for both sides did not receive ECF notice of docket entry 112 setting a briefing schedule on the emergency motion to clarify #106 and the emergency cross-motion to compel #109 . Because that highly unusual circumstance is beyond the litigants' control, the Court will permit Plaintiffs to file by 8:00 p.m. tonight the brief that they would have filed yesterday had they received the ECF notice containing the briefing schedule. The Court will review that brief and then determine whether to request a reply brief or to simply issue a written order reaffirming, revising, or vacating the order #113 issued earlier today. The briefing schedule on the emergency cross-motion #109 is also modified and the response is now due no later than 7/13/2020. As previously noted, the Court will issue a ruling on the cross-motion to compel in the same order as its ruling on the renewed motion to lift freeze order #90 . Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 114 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by D. Richard Self (Self, D.)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 7/9/2020. Defendants' emergency motion to clarify scope of expedited discovery #106 is granted. For further details see the Statement below. Mailed notice(cdh, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion for extension of time to file answer #96 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to seal memorandum of law #110 is granted. Defendants' emergency motion to clarify scope of expedited discovery #106 is taken under advisement; response is due by 5pm on 7/8/2020; the Court will either (a) request a reply brief, (b) issue a ruling by mail, or (c) set the matter for hearing and oral ruling on 7/9/2020. If a hearing will be necessary, the Courtroom Deputy will email counsel no later than 10:00 a.m. and the hearing will take place at 12:00 noon central time as the Court has a 10:30 a.m. sentencing. If the sentencing takes longer than anticipated, the Courtroom Deputy will advise counsel by email of any adjustments to the schedule. Plaintiffs' emergency cross-motion to compel #109 is taken under advisement; response is due by 7/10/2020; Plaintiffs' have agreed to waive reply. The motion will be taken with the renewed motion to amend the asset freeze order. Mailed notice(cdh, ) (cdh, ).
July 7, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Joseph Andreozzi for presentment of (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 7, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Second Emergency Motion to Lift Asset Freeze Order and EMERGENCY Cross-Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 concerning Defendants' Unfrozen Assets [DKT. #108 and #109] (Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 7, 2020 Filing 109 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (EMERGENCY Cross-Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 concerning Defendants' Unfrozen Assets) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 7, 2020 Filing 108 SEALED RESPONSE by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order #90 (Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Second Emergency Motion to Lift Asset Freeze Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Geoffrey Potter, #2 Exhibit 1-to the Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2-to the Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3-to the Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4-to the Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5-to the Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6-to the Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7-to the Declaration)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
July 7, 2020 Filing 107 Emergency NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 7, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps TO CLARIFY SCOPE OF EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Emergency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 7, 2020 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Erin K. Sullivan to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, and Mike Phipps #73 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to file under seal exhibits in support of emergency motion to exclude documents improperly seized #99 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Status hearing regarding the testing and return of defendants' seized inventory is held and continued until 7/15/20 at 4:00 p.m. Defendants are ordered to produce to plaintiffs on or before 7/13/20 a computerized database with information regarding each of the 1,285,111 individual seized products referenced in defendants' 6/29/20 proposal #77 concerning each product's lot number, expiration date, and vendor from whom the product was obtained. Plaintiffs agree that they will not make use of the information provided in the database to contact any of defendants' vendors prior to the next 7/15/20 status hearing. Defendants' emergency motion to exclude documents improperly seized #98 is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, plaintiffs are prohibited from marking as deposition exhibits any documents they obtained by virtue of the Court's Seizure Order #31 that concern the sale or disposition of non-Ethicon products - such as the examples listed in Paragraph 9(a)-(e) of defendants' motion unless and until such documents are properly obtained by plaintiffs through the discovery process. Defendants' motion is otherwise denied without prejudice to their right to raise at some future date additional arguments and objections to the use of such documents. The call-in number for the hearing is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 3997645. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The emergency motion to exclude documents improperly seized #98 is within the scope of the referral to Magistrate Judge Cummings. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 6, 2020 Filing 100 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps regarding MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY SEIZED #98 (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 6, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to seal exhibits (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 6, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY SEIZED (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 6, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 6, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps for extension of time to file answer (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 3, 2020 Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' renewed emergency motion to lift asset freeze order #90 is taken under advisement. Response is due by 7/7/2020; reply is due by 7/10/2020. The Court will either issue a ruling by mail or set the matter for a telephonic hearing during the week of 7/13/2020. Defendants' motion to file under seal #91 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 94 RESPONSE by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to sealed response,, #78 Defendants Advanced Inventory Mgmt, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr. Jason Einhorn, Mike Phipps Response to Plaintiffs' Memorandum Concerning Testing of Seized Product (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 1, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr re MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to seal The Declaration of Anne Tuzik (July 1, 2020) In Support Of Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order #91 , MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order #90 (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 1, 2020 Filing 92 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr Ex. 1 - Declaration of Anne Tuzik (July 1, 2020) regarding MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order #90 (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 1, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to seal The Declaration of Anne Tuzik (July 1, 2020) In Support Of Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 1, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr Renewed Emergency Motion To Lift Asset Freeze Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
July 1, 2020 Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #84 , #85 , #86 , and #87 are granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Telephonic status hearing regarding the testing and return of defendants' seized inventory is scheduled for 7/7/20 at 11:00 a.m. The call-in number for the status hearing is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 3997645. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cc, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages 74 and Plaintiffs' motion to seal 75 are granted. Upon review of today's filings [77, 78] regarding testing and return of seized inventory, it appears that both the volume of seized products and the organization of Defendants' inventory present significant challenges in devising a protocol for ensuring the twin aims of (a) protecting the public from the sale of counterfeit items from Defendants' stock while (b) enabling Defendants to run the legitimate aspects of their business. It is not uncommon in litigation especially where a request for preliminary injunctive relief is involved to rely on sampling to examine a fraction of the documents or tangible items involved in the litigation from which the parties and the Court can extrapolate to draw relatively reliable conclusions, subject of course to confirmation or rejection as the case moves forward. The notion that discovery should be proportional to the needs of the case at every stage is enshrined in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and that notion certainly applies here, where testing every item would be impracticable over the next six weeks before the preliminary injunction hearing or at any other stage of the case. But the parties must speak a common language to reach a workable protocol. Today's filings show that they are not there, despite thIs Court's wishful thinking for an agreed order. This issue is referred to Magistrate Judge Cummings so that he can assist counsel in defining and narrowing the parameters for a sensible testing regime. Once the order referring this matter is on the docket, Judge Cummings' Courtroom Deputy will contact counsel by email to set up a telephonic status hearing. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages #74 and Plaintiffs' motion to seal #75 are granted. Upon review of today's filings [77, 78] regarding testing and return of seized inventory, it appears that both the volume of seized products and the organization of Defendants' inventory present significant challenges in devising a protocol for ensuring the twin aims of (a) protecting the public from the sale of counterfeit items from Defendants' stock while (b) enabling Defendants to run the legitimate aspects of their business. It is not uncommon in litigation especially where a request for preliminary injunctive relief is involved to rely on sampling to examine a fraction of the documents or tangible items involved in the litigation from which the parties and the Court can extrapolate to draw relatively reliable conclusions, subject of course to confirmation or rejection as the case moves forward. The notion that discovery should be proportional to the needs of the case at every stage is enshrined in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and that notion certainly applies here, where testing every item would be impracticable over the next six weeks before the preliminary injunction hearing or at any other stage of the case. But the parties must speak a common language to reach a workable protocol. Today's filings show that they are not there, despite thIs Court's wishful thinking for an agreed order. This issue is referred to Magistrate Judge Cummings so that he can assist counsel in defining and narrowing the parameters for a sensible testing regime. Once the order referring this matter is on the docket, Judge Cummings' Courtroom Deputy will contact counsel by email to set up a telephonic status hearing. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 79 Notice of Compliance with Seizure Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
June 29, 2020 Filing 78 SEALED RESPONSE by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal #75 (MEMORANDUM CONCERNING TESTING OF SEIZED PRODUCT IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S JUNE 25, 2020 ORDER) ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Andreozzi, Bradley)
June 29, 2020 Filing 77 Proposal by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps Regarding Testing and Return of Seized Inventory (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 29, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Joseph Andreozzi for presentment of (Andreozzi, Bradley)
June 29, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal (Andreozzi, Bradley)
June 29, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Andreozzi, Bradley)
June 29, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike PhippsMotion For Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erin K.Sullivan (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 29, 2020 Filing 72 PAYMENT by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps of Pro Hac Fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17156745. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 28, 2020 Filing 71 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the revised schedule set out in the stipulation #53 filed on 6/23/2020, the hearing set for 6/30/2020 at 10:15 a.m. has been stricken and reset to 8/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion to quash #69 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/17/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 26, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to quash Amended And Supplemented Motion To Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY THE COURT'S ASSET FREEZE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 6/26/2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 67 STIPULATION regarding order #30 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Modify The Court's Asset Freeze Order (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 25, 2020 Filing 66 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/25/20.(smm, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 65 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 6/25/2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 6/25/2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/24/20 before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Order Number: 38686. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kristin M. Ashenhurst, CSR, RDR, CRR, 312-818-6549.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2020. (Ashenhurst, Kristin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 61 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/16/20 before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kristin M Ashenhurst, CSR, RDR, CRR, (312)818-6549. (Ashenhurst, Kristin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court transcript dated 6/16/2020 shall filed under seal. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 59 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to status report #58 (Morrissey, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 58 STATUS Report by Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 24, 2020 Filing 57 STATUS Report by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morrissey, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion to quash #55 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/17/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 24, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to quash subpoena (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
June 24, 2020 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: As discussed on the record and by agreement of the parties, this case is shall be unsealed forthwith. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 63 LETTER from FNBC Bank & Trust dated 6/17/20. (Attachments). (gcy, )
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESET DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO RESET ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SEIZURE CONFIRMATION HEARING Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 6/23/2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Orders 50 and 51 are vacated as entered in error. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 51 VACATED as entered in error. Modified on 6/23/2020 (cdh, ).
June 23, 2020 Filing 50 VACATED as entered in error. Modified on 6/23/2020 (cdh, ).
June 23, 2020 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Modify the Court's June 16, 2020 Seizure Order or, Alternatively, for Entry of a Protective Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (td, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Reset Discovery and Briefing Schedule and to Reset Order to Show Cause and Seizure Confirmation Hearing. (td, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion to exceed page limitations #39 is granted. Plaintiffs' emergency motion for order to show cause #38 is taken under advisement. Defendants' motion to file under seal #46 is granted. Defendants' emergency motion to lift asset freeze order #43 is taken under advisement. If either side would like to file an additional memorandum in response to the emergency motions filed today, they should do so by 5:00pm on 6/23/2020 so the Court can review the filings prior to the hearing, which will take place telephonically on 6/24/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Please use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. as to Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020; Jason Einhorn on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020; Anthony Iaderosa, Jr on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020; Mike Phipps on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020; Mudassar Shah on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (td, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Emergency Motions by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (td, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants in Contempt, and in Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Lift Asset Freeze Order by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc (Exhibits). (td, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to exceeed page limitations. (td, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. for order an order to show cause to hold defendants in contempt. (td, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 46 EMERGENCY MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps to file under seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(td, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by Matthew Thomas Connelly. (td, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch. (td, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION by Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Anthony Iaderosa, Jr to lift asset freeze order (Exhibits). (td, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 37 TRO BOND in the amount of $ 50,000.00 posted by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (Document not imaged) (rp, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Sealed ex parte emergency motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' emergency motion to seal #8 is granted. Plaintiffs' emergency motion to exceed page limitations #9 is granted. Emergency motion for ex parte seizure order, temporary restraining order, asset freeze order, expedited discovery order, alternative service, and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction #10 is granted. Signed Orders to follow. Defendants' response briefs are due June 24, 2020; Plaintiffs' reply briefs are due June 29, 2020. Status hearing and hearing on confirmation of seizure order are set for June 30, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 35 EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 34 SEALING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 31 SEIZURE ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 30 ASSET FREEZE ORDER against Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., d/b/a Esutures.com, Anthony Iaderosa Jr., and Mudassar Shah. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 29 TEMPORARY Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/16/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Emergency telephonic hearing on sealed motions for temporary restraining order #10 , motion to seal #8 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 are set for 6/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (cdh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing by All Plaintiffs (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Ryan Frye (Exhibits) (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Rao M. Afsar Uz Zaman (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Michael Houston (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of James Meredith (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Kurt Bally (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Rauso (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Ben Russo (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Benjamin D. Fitz (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Cameron McLain (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Denise Dacey (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Daniel Burkley (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Potter (Exhibits) (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Advanced Inventory Management, Inc., Jason Einhorn, Anthony Iaderosa, Jr, Mike Phipps, Mudassar Shah (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM of Law by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. in support of emergency motions for ex parte seizure order, temporary restraining order, asset freeze order, expedited discovery order, alternative service, and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction #10 (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Emergency Motions by Geoffrey Potter, Bradley Joseph Andreozzi for presentment of motion to seal pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 1116 #8 , motion to exceed page limitations #9 , motion for ex parte seizure order, temporary restraining order, asset freeze order, expedited discovery order, alternative service, and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction #10 (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. for ex parte seizure order, temporary restraining order, asset freeze order, expedited discovery order, alternative service, and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Seizure Order, #2 Proposed TRO, #3 Proposed Asset Freeze Order, #4 Proposed Discovery Order, #5 Proposed Order)(sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to exceed page limitations (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. to seal pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 1116 and supporting memorandum of law (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of claims involving trademarks by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. by Matthew M Morrissey. (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. by Bradley Joseph Andreozzi. (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. by Geoffrey Potter. (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.; Jury Demand. (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson & Johnson et al v. Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Phipps
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Connelly
Represented By: Alexander S. Vesselinovitch
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Represented By: Michael S Denniston
Represented By: Gregory Glen Marshall
Represented By: D. Richard Self
Represented By: Jack Wright Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mudassar Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Iaderosa, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Connelly
Represented By: Alexander S. Vesselinovitch
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Represented By: Michael S Denniston
Represented By: Gregory Glen Marshall
Represented By: D. Richard Self
Represented By: Jack Wright Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Inventory Management, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Connelly
Represented By: Alexander S. Vesselinovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Einhorn
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Connelly
Represented By: Alexander S. Vesselinovitch
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Represented By: Michael S Denniston
Represented By: Gregory Glen Marshall
Represented By: D. Richard Self
Represented By: Jack Wright Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Inventory Management, Inc. doing business as Esutures.com
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Connelly
Represented By: Alexander S. Vesselinovitch
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Represented By: Michael S Denniston
Represented By: Gregory Glen Marshall
Represented By: D. Richard Self
Represented By: Jack Wright Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Andreozzi
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Matthew M Morrissey
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Andreozzi
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Matthew M Morrissey
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethicon US, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Andreozzi
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Matthew M Morrissey
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Andreozzi
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Matthew M Morrissey
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?