Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund et al v. Millennium Contracting Co.
Plaintiff: Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund and CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Defendant: MILLENNIUM CONTRACTING CO.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03474
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund. Millennium Contracting Co. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Carollo, Amy)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 9/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. The courtroom deputy will contact parties if hearing will proceed via Teleconference. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 15, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MILLENNIUM CONTRACTING CO. (dxb, )
June 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Katherine C.V. Mosenson (Mosenson, Katherine)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Patrick T. Wallace (Wallace, Patrick)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by G Ryan Liska (Liska, G)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Sara Stewart Schumann (Schumann, Sara)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Amy Nicole Carollo (Carollo, Amy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carollo, Amy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17107424. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B and C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Carollo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund et al v. Millennium Contracting Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wenskus
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Welfare Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHICAGO & VICINITY LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL RETIREE HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLENNIUM CONTRACTING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?