Prachasitthisak et al v. Locke Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gurdhian Singh, Michael Prachasitthisak and Eimear Kenny
Defendant: Locke Transportation, Inc. and Teresa Locascio
Case Number: 1:2020cv03483
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Locascio, Locke Transportation, Inc. by Paul Ely Starkman (re-filing) (Starkman, Paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED complaint by Michael Prachasitthisak, Eimear Kenny, Gurdhian Singh against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Opt-In Forms))(Barack, Max)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #10 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The defendants' answer or other response to the complaint is now due on 8/28/20. Mailed notice (air, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Paul Ely Starkman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Starkman, Paul)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Teresa Locascio, Locke Transportation, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Starkman, Paul)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Prachasitthisak, Eimear Kenny, Gurdhian Singh. Teresa Locascio waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Barack, Max)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Locascio, Locke Transportation, Inc. by Samuel J. Tallman (Tallman, Samuel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teresa Locascio, Locke Transportation, Inc. by Paul Ely Starkman (Starkman, Paul)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 8/17/20. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Prachasitthisak, Eimear Kenny, Gurdhian Singh as to Locke Transportation, Inc. on 7/12/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Barack, Max)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Eimear Kenny, Michael Prachasitthisak, Gurdhian Singh by Max Phillip Barack (Barack, Max)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barack, Max)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Prachasitthisak, Eimear Kenny, Gurdhian Singh; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17110017.(Barack, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prachasitthisak et al v. Locke Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locke Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel J. Tallman
Represented By: Paul Ely Starkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Locascio
Represented By: Samuel J. Tallman
Represented By: Paul Ely Starkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurdhian Singh
Represented By: Max Phillip Barack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Prachasitthisak
Represented By: Max Phillip Barack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eimear Kenny
Represented By: Max Phillip Barack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?