International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Respondent: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv03559
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal #22 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and fees. The deadline to file a status report is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice (Godiner, Clifford)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Respondent's second unopposed motion #20 for an extension of its deadline to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is granted. Respondent's deadline to answer or otherwise plead to the First Amended Complaint #4 is extended to and including 8/10/2020. The deadline (see ECF No. #18 ) of 7/31/2020 to file a status report is extended to and including 8/19/2020.Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company for extension of time to file answer regarding other, #4 Unopposed (Godiner, Clifford)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Respondent's unopposed motion #17 for an extension to and including 7/24/2020 of its deadline to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #1 is granted. The deadline of 7/8/2020 to file a status report is stricken. A status report is due on or before 7/31/2020. Mailed notice (mjc, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Unopposed (Godiner, Clifford)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before July 8, 2020. Counsel are advised to consult Judge Gottschall's page on the court's website (www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for guidance on the contents of the status report.Mailed notice (mjc, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division by Erika A Diehl-Gibbons (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company by Clifford A. Godiner (Godiner, Clifford)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (nsf, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 RECEIVED from Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02002 (nsf,)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 6) is granted in partand denied in part. In particular, the court grants Union Pacific's Motion to the extent that it seeks an order finding that this court lacks personal jurisdiction over Union Pacific. However, the Motion is denied to the extent that it seeks dismissal. Rather, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631, the court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/29/2020. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Reply in support of #6 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Bay, William) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Response in Opposition to #6 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Erika Diehl-Gibbons Declaration, #2 Affidavit Ralph Leichliter Declaration)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Potter, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Terrill Maxwell) (Bay, William) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company. Related document(s) #4 . (Bay, William) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance by William R. Bay Special Appearance filed by on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Bay, William) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 First Amended complaint against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Monjaras Award, #2 Exhibit B - Arroyo Award, #3 Exhibit C - Coles Award) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9499901. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Monjaras Award, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Arroyo Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Clifford A. Godiner
Represented By: William R. Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?