Hartman v. Kleinman et al
Plaintiff: Moshe Hartman
Defendant: Ohio Apartment Rental Holdings LLC, Chicago First Tower LLC, Chicago Second Tower LLC, Abraham Kleinman, Noble Place Apartments Holding LLC and South Shore Tower 1 LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03598
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The Court is unavailable on 8/25/2020. The status hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 9/1/2020 at 11:15 a.m. and will be heard by telephone conference. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER extending Temporary Restraining Order. The response to the motion for preliminary injunction is extended to 8/19/2020. The Temporary Restraining Order is extended to 8/31/2020. Status hearing set for 7/29/2020 is stricken and reset to 8/25/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 7/23/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for discovery #13 is granted as stated on the record. Mailed notice (ags)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing and motion hearing held via teleconference. By agreement, the TRO is extended to 8/5/2020. Response to the motion for preliminary injunction #12 is due by 7/22/2020. Status hearing is set for 7/29/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago First Tower LLC, Chicago Second Tower LLC, Abraham Kleinman, Noble Place Apartments Holding LLC, Ohio Apartment Rental Holdings LLC, South Shore Tower 1 LLC by John Joseph Emmett Zummo (Zummo, John Joseph)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Telephonic motion hearing held. Counsel appearing for defendant should file an attorney appearance. As stated on the record, the motion for extension of the TRO #11 is granted and is extended to 7/17/2020. Status hearing and a motion hearing on the remaining motions #12 and #13 are set for 7/8/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: A motion hearing is set for 7/1/2020 at 9:35 a.m. and will be heard telephonically. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Moshe Hartman re MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and to Set a Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Petition for Preliminary Injunction #13 , MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for temporary restraining order 1.Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order #11 , declaration, #14 , MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for preliminary injunction 2.Plaintiff's Petition for Preliminary Injunction #12 and Certificate of Service of Same (Belofsky, David) Modified on 6/30/2020 (smm, ).
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Moshe Hartman regarding motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for preliminary injunction #12 Supplemental Declaration of Moshe Hartman in Support of His Emergency Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Petition for Preliminary Injunction (Belofsky, David)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and to Set a Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Petition for Preliminary Injunction (Belofsky, David) Modified on 6/30/2020 (smm, ).
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Petition for Preliminary Injunction (Belofsky, David) Modified on 6/30/2020 (smm, ).
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order (Belofsky, David) Modified on 6/30/2020 (smm, ).
June 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago First Tower LLC, Chicago Second Tower LLC, Abraham Kleinman, Noble Place Apartments Holding LLC, Ohio Apartment Rental Holdings LLC, South Shore Tower 1 LLC (daj, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 8/18/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 6/19/2020. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic motion hearing held on Plaintiff's motion for temporary retraining order. #2 Plaintiff's counsel, Individual Defendant Abraham Kleinman, and mediator Norman Isan appeared telephonically. For the reasons stated on the record and without objection from individual defendant, Plaintiff's motion #2 is granted. Between today June 19, 2020 and July 3, 2020 Mr. Kleiman agrees not seek any additional financing on Five (5) properties South Shore Tower 1 LLC, Chicago First Tower LLC, Chicago Second Tower LLC, Ohio Apartment Rental Holdings LLC, and Noble Place Apartments Holding LLC. named in the complaint. It is further ordered that Mr. Kleinman shall only disperse rents in the normal course and shall not take any of the rents for his personal use. The court has determined that no bond is necessary under FRCP 65(c) in light of the fact that Defendant stated on the record that he has no plans to further encumber the properties. Order to follow. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Moshe Hartman by David Alan Belofsky (Belofsky, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Belofsky, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Moshe Hartman in support of motion for temporary restraining order #2 (Belofsky, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Devorah Hartman regarding motion for temporary restraining order #2 (Belofsky, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Moshe Hartman regarding motion for temporary restraining order #2 (Belofsky, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Moshe Hartman for temporary restraining order (Belofsky, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Moshe Hartman; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17126312.(Belofsky, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. Kleinman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Apartment Rental Holdings LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Emmett Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago First Tower LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Emmett Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Second Tower LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Emmett Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Kleinman
Represented By: John Joseph Emmett Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Place Apartments Holding LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Emmett Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Shore Tower 1 LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Emmett Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Hartman
Represented By: David Alan Belofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?