ABC LTD. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: ABC LTD. and GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2020cv03726
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 32 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/17/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephonic motion hearing held on 8/17/2020. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #24 is granted. Enter Order. Oral motion by plaintiff to unseal certain documents is granted. The Clerk of Court is to unseal documents #2 , #3 , #9 , #11 , #13 , and #17 . Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/3/2020. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #24 is entered and continued to 8/17/2020 at 9:30 AM as a telephonic motion hearing. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
July 29, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
July 29, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
July 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
July 29, 2020 NEW PARTIES: GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD. added to case caption. Terminating ABC LTD. (Vogt, Keith)
July 27, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 8/5/2020 is stricken and reset as a telephonic status hearing for 8/3/2020 at 10:15 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 22 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by ABC LTD. (Document not scanned) (ph, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #19 is granted. The Court extends the temporary restraining order to August 5, 2020. No appearance necessary on 7/22/2020. Status hearing set for 7/22/2020 is stricken and reset to 8/5/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #19 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/22/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC LTD. for extension of time (Vogt, Keith)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/8/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, ) Modified on 8/18/2020 (sxb, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephonic motion hearing held on 7/8/2020. Plaintiff's sealed motion #11 is granted. Enter Order. Telephonic status hearing is set for 7/22/2020 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #8 and sealed motion #10 are granted. The Court sets a telephonic motion hearing for presentment of plaintiff's sealed motion #12 on 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 MAILED Sealed Trademark Report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (pj, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 CORRECTED First Amended Complaint #9 by Plaintiff ABC LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Schedule A)(Vogt, Keith) Modified on 8/18/2020 (sxb, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC LTD. Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Ex Parte Motion for Entry Of A Temporary Restraining Order, Including A Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, And Service Of Process By Email and/or Electronic Publication #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of John Doe, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of John Doe, #5 Exhibit 2, Part 1 to the Declaration of John Doe, #6 Exhibit 2, Part 2 to the Declaration of John Doe, #7 Exhibit 2, Part 3 to the Declaration of John Doe, #8 Exhibit 2, Part 4 to the Declaration of John Doe, #9 Exhibit 2, Part 5 to the Declaration of John Doe, #10 Exhibit 2, Part 6 to the Declaration of John Doe, #11 Exhibit 2, Part 7 to the Declaration of John Doe, #12 Exhibit 2, Part 8 to the Declaration of John Doe, #13 Exhibit 2, Part 9 to the Declaration of John Doe, #14 Exhibit 2, Part 10 to the Declaration of John Doe)(Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC LTD. Plaintiff Ex Parte Motion for Entry Of A Temporary Restraining Order, Including A Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, And Service Of Process By Email and/or Electronic Publication (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 8/18/2020 (sxb, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC LTD. Plaintiff Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff ABC LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Schedule A)(Vogt, Keith) Modified on 8/18/2020 (sxb, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC LTD. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC LTD. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC LTD. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC LTD. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC LTD. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 8/18/2020 (sxb, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC LTD. Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 8/18/2020 (sxb, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ABC LTD.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17145085. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC LTD. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC LTD.
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLOBAL MERCHANDISING SERVICES LTD.
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?