Jane Doe v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and Barbara Lynn Poffo
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2020cv03736
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 8/25/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 14, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #37 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/25/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
August 14, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Barbara Lynn Poffo in support of motion for default judgment #37 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
August 14, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION by Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Poffo for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith)
July 28, 2020 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/28/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 9/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #26 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk shall unseal this case. The Law firm of JiangIP LLC., is ordered to add ALL defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 9/30/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 25, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
July 24, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff shall send a copy of Dkt. 32 order to all Defendants. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #26 set for 7/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 7/28/2020 at 9:15 a.m. #24 is re-set to 9:00 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Lynn Poffo as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Poffo by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Poffo by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Barbara Lynn Poffo in support of motion for preliminary injunction #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Poffo for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Poffo by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
July 23, 2020 NEW PARTIES: Barbara Lynn Poffo added to case caption. Terminating Jane Doe (Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 7/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. #20 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Jane Doe. (Document not scanned) (ph, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 7/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #18 is granted. The TRO #17 is extended to 7/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The motion hearing set for 7/14/2020 #19 is stricken. The status hearing set for 7/14/2020 #16 is stricken and re-set for 7/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/14/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Jane Doe for extension of time (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cp, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED TRO ORDER signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/30/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #8 , motion to exceed page limitation #10 , and ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #11 are granted. Enter TRO sealed order. Telephonic status hearing set for 7/14/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing set for 6/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings, pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/26/2020. (pj, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 MAILED Sealed Trademark Report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (pj, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Jane Doe Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Ex Parte Motion for Entry Of A Temporary Restraining Order, Including A Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, And Service Of Process By Email and/or Electronic Publication #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Jane Doe, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jane Doe, #5 Exhibit 2, Part 1 to the Declaration of Jane Doe, #6 Exhibit 2, Part 2 to the Declaration of Jane Doe)(Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Jane Doe Plaintiff Ex Parte Motion for Entry Of A Temporary Restraining Order, Including A Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, And Service Of Process By Email and/or Electronic Publication (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Jane Doe Plaintiff Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Jane Doe First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Schedule A)(Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Jane Doe for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Jane Doe Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Jane Doe Sealed Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jane Doe; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17145997. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lynn Poffo
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?