Cantwell et al v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Plaintiff: Diana Tait, Jenny Rossano, Karai Hamilton, Jae Jones, Debra French, Cindy Peters, Demetrios Tsiptsis, Carol Cantwell, Christina Parlow, Connie Sandler, Kaye Mallory, Terri Birt, Michelle Ingrodi, David Rothberg and Arnetta Velez
Defendant: Select Milk Producers, Inc., The Coca-Cola Company, Mike McCloskey, Fairlife, LLC and Sue McCloskey
Case Number: 1:2020cv03739
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the status report #8 filed on 8/12/2020, the status hearing set for 8/17/2020 in this matter, a recent MDL tag-along case, will be stricken and continued to 9/3/2020 at 10:00 a.m., which is the next scheduled status hearing in MDL 2909. All deadlines in this separate docket are suspended until 9/3/2020.Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS Report by Terri Birt, Carol Cantwell, Debra French, Karai Hamilton, Michelle Ingrodi, Jae Jones, Kaye Mallory, Christina Parlow, Cindy Peters, Jenny Rossano, David Rothberg, Connie Sandler, Diana Tait, Demetrios Tsiptsis, Arnetta Velez (Keller, Amy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terri Birt, Carol Cantwell, Debra French, Karai Hamilton, Michelle Ingrodi, Jae Jones, Kaye Mallory, Christina Parlow, Cindy Peters, Jenny Rossano, David Rothberg, Connie Sandler, Diana Tait, Demetrios Tsiptsis, Arnetta Velez by Amy Elisabeth Keller (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Keller, Amy)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 8/17/2020 at 9:10 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the 8/17/2020 hearing is as follows: Please use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747.Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terri Birt, Carol Cantwell, Debra French, Karai Hamilton, Michelle Ingrodi, Jae Jones, Kaye Mallory, Christina Parlow, Cindy Peters, Jenny Rossano, David Rothberg, Connie Sandler, Diana Tait, Demetrios Tsiptsis, Arnetta Velez by George Volney Granade, Ii (Granade, George)
June 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (cp, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terri Birt, Carol Cantwell, Debra French, Karai Hamilton, Michelle Ingrodi, Jae Jones, Kaye Mallory, Christina Parlow, Cindy Peters, Jenny Rossano, David Rothberg, Connie Sandler, Diana Tait, Demetrios Tsiptsis, Arnetta Velez by Michael Robert Reese (Reese, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Reese, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Karai Hamilton, Debra French, Jae Jones, Carol Cantwell, Christina Parlow, Cindy Peters, Jenny Rossano, Connie Sandler, Arnetta Velez, Terri Birt, Demetrios Tsiptsis, Kaye Mallory, Diana Tait, David Rothberg, Michelle Ingrodi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17146219.(Reese, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantwell et al v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Tait
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Rossano
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karai Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jae Jones
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra French
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Peters
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrios Tsiptsis
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Cantwell
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Parlow
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Sandler
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Mallory
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Birt
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ingrodi
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rothberg
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnetta Velez
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade, Ii
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Milk Producers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairlife, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?