Hancock et al v. Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Dale A. Bolt, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, William H. Collins and David M. Snelten
Defendant: Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03757
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #13 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (dal, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Scanlon, Cecilia)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten for order , MOTION by Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten for hearing , MOTION by Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten for rule to show cause (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cecilia M. Scanlon, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/25/2020. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/25/2020. Only plaintiff appears. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and for an order directing Defendant to turn over monthly fringe benefit contribution reports #8 is granted. The Court enters default against Defendant Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc. Defendant shall provide fringe benefit contribution reports to plaintiff. Enter Order. By 10/15/2020, Plaintiff shall file a status report setting forth: (1) the status of production of the fringe benefit contribution reports, and (2) whether Plaintiff requires any additional action from the Court prior to the filing a motion for entry of judgment. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Richard J. Clarson (Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten for order directing Defendant to turn over monthly fringe benefit contribution reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial by Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten (Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, Dale A. Bolt, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten, William H. Collins as to Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc. on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Scanlon, Cecilia)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:Initial telephonic status hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
June 26, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc. (acm, )
June 26, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten by Laura M. Finnegan (Finnegan, Laura)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan Gallagher, Terrence J. Hancock, Dale A. Bolt, John J. Lisner, David M. Snelten, William H. Collins; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17149040. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scanlon, Cecilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock et al v. Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale A. Bolt
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Gallagher
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence J. Hancock
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Lisner
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Collins
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Snelten
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alsterda Cartage & Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?