BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Serur et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Emily Perez, Victor Serur and Serur Development L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03777
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Defendants' answer is now due 8/17/20 and the parties' joint initial status report remains due 8/28/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Chapin, Aaron)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 8/28/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. as to Emily Perez on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Chapin, Aaron) Modified on 7/24/2020 (smm, ).
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. as to Victor Serur on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Chapin, Aaron) Modified on 7/24/2020 (smm, ).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 29, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Emily Perez, Victor Serur, Serur Development L.L.C. (exr, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Chapin, Aaron)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. by Aaron B. Chapin (Chapin, Aaron)
June 26, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chapin, Aaron)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.; N. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17151396. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Chapin, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Serur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Serur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serur Development L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Aaron B. Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?