Doe v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE and MINOR PLAINTIFF F.H.
Defendant: ANTHONY ESCAMILLA, TRACY GARFIELD, BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF CHICAGO and Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The doing business as Chicago Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2020cv03857
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendant's motion for extension of time #16 is granted. Defendant's response is now due 9/21/20. Plaintiff's reply is now due 9/28/20. No hearing on the motion will be conducted on 9/1/20.Mailed notice (air, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Christy Lynn Michaelson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/1/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Michaelson, Christy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The, Anthony Escamilla, Tracy Garfield for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) (Michaelson, Christy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tracy Garfield by Christy Lynn Michaelson (Michaelson, Christy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tracy Garfield by Elizabeth Kathleen Barton (Barton, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane Doe. Tracy Garfield waiver sent on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Covert, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anthony Escamilla by Elizabeth Kathleen Barton (Barton, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anthony Escamilla by Christy Lynn Michaelson (Michaelson, Christy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane Doe. Anthony Escamilla waiver sent on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Covert, John) Modified on 7/27/2020 (smm, ).
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 9/7/20. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane Doe. Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The waiver sent on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Covert, John) Modified on 7/22/2020 (smm, ).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The by Christy Lynn Michaelson (Michaelson, Christy)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The by Lindsey Erin Goldberg (Goldberg, Lindsey)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The by Elizabeth Kathleen Barton (Barton, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion to proceed anonymously #2 is granted. Plaintiff parent shall be referred to in filings as Jane Doe; Plaintiff child shall be referred to as F.H. Mailed notice (air, )
July 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff F.H. for leave to file Proceed Anonymously (JANE DOE/F.H.) (Covert, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by F.H.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17162682. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Covert, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY ESCAMILLA
Represented By: Christy Lynn Michaelson
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathleen Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY GARFIELD
Represented By: Christy Lynn Michaelson
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathleen Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago, The doing business as Chicago Public Schools
Represented By: Lindsey Erin Goldberg
Represented By: Christy Lynn Michaelson
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathleen Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: John Galt Covert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINOR PLAINTIFF F.H.
Represented By: John Galt Covert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?