John Doe v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto, shenping02, Junlong03, toponlineshop, Feida98, besgohomedecor, Goodtime98, Lizhang02, Shen07, beibei_shop, Angelina_baby, wilove and Jinmei01
Case Number: 1:2020cv03892
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Hierl, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice #35 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Defendants sport1688, clothingdh, Fashionlot, Neidok, wangyicom, Yuzhaolin, and enjoy_shopping_here are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Hierl, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #33 , the ten defendants listed in the notice are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Hierl, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/3/2020. Mailed notice(air, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the grounds set forth in the motion, plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #28 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order.Mailed notice (air, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Hierl, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by John Doe in support of motion for preliminary injunction #28 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #26 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The plaintiff represents that a third party has not completed effectuating the TRO. The plaintiff thus has been unable to put measures in place authorized by the Court's prior order to ensure that the defendants do not move assets out of U.S.-based accounts. Based on the plaintiff's representation, the Court finds good cause to extend the deadline for the temporary restraining order #23 . That deadline is now extended through 8/4/2020. Mailed notice (air, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Filing 24 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 23 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 7/7/2020. Mailed notice(air, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the grounds set forth in the motion, plaintiff's ex parte motion for TRO #10 is granted. Plaintiff's motions for leave to file under seal #6 and for leave to file excess pages #9 are granted. Enter Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (air, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 7 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Santiago Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Reiter Declaration, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 1 (Hierl, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Doe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17168701.(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenping02
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junlong03
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toponlineshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feida98
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: besgohomedecor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodtime98
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizhang02
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shen07
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beibei_shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelina_baby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wilove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinmei01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?