Mathys v. The Hartford Gold Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Mathys
Defendant: David Wolan, The Hartford Gold Group, LLC and The Hartford Gold Group, LLC doing business as American Hartford Gold Group
Case Number: 1:2020cv03927
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE by John Mathysin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants The Hartford Gold Group, LLC, David Wolan to compel arbitration and dismiss or stay proceedings #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F)(Holmes, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to compel arbitration, and to dismiss or stay proceedings #13 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 9/3/2020; Reply is due by 9/10/2020. Court will rule by mail. Motion to compel #14 is improperly filed as a motion. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: In light of the motion to compel arbitration, and to dismiss or stay proceedings filed on 8/10/2020 #13 , Motion to compel arbitration #10 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants The Hartford Gold Group, LLC, David Wolan to compel memorandum of law in support of motion to compel arbitration (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Reubel, #2 Declaration of David J. Cohen, #3 Declaration of David Wolan, #4 Declaration of Paul Stone)(Cohen, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants The Hartford Gold Group, LLC, David Wolan to compel arbitration and dismiss or stay proceedings (Cohen, David)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of First Amended Complaint (Dkt. 11) (Aug. 3, 2020) (Holmes, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by John Mathys against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N, #15 Exhibit Ex. O)(Holmes, William)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants David Wolan, The Hartford Gold Group, LLC to dismiss and to compel arbitration (Attachments: #1 memorandum of law in support of motion to compel arbitration, #2 Declaration declaration of Jennifer Reubel, #3 Declaration declaration of David J. Cohen, #4 Declaration declaration of David Wolan, #5 Declaration declaration of Paul Stone)(Cohen, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Hartford Gold Group, LLC, David Wolan by James Gregory Argionis (Argionis, James)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Hartford Gold Group, LLC, David Wolan by Corey Thomas Hickman (Hickman, Corey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17236581. (Cohen, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff John Mathys regarding Summons and Complaint served on David Wolan on 7/15/20 (Holmes, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff John Mathys regarding Summons and Complaint served on Hartford Gold Group LLC on 7/13/2020 (Holmes, William)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 6, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The Hartford Gold Group, LLC, David Wolan (jg, )
July 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Holmes, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Mathys; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17174774. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N)(Holmes, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathys v. The Hartford Gold Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wolan
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Represented By: James Gregory Argionis
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Gold Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Gold Group, LLC doing business as American Hartford Gold Group
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Represented By: James Gregory Argionis
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mathys
Represented By: William Clifton Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?