Laufer v. Gajanand Corporation
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Defendant: Gajanand Corporation and Arya Info Tech., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03964
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 1:20-cv-01230 (bg)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 7/6/2020. In light of Plaintiff's response #5 to the Court's Order to Show Cause, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois. (EWL, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Deborah Laufer . (Corkill, Kimberly) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2020. (JRK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 7/1/2020. The Amended Complaint suggests this cause of action arose in LaSalle County, Illinois. LaSalle County is located in the Northern District of Illinois, not the Central District of Illinois. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days of the date of this Order explaining why this case should not be transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (EWL, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arya Info Tech., Inc., filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons)(Corkill, Kimberly) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gajanand Corporation. (FDS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kimberly Ann Corkill on behalf of Deborah Laufer (Corkill, Kimberly) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gajanand Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3400466.), filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Corkill, Kimberly) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer v. Gajanand Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Corkill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gajanand Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arya Info Tech., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?