Tekway Inc. v. AT&T Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tekway Inc.
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04095
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing held on 6/24/2021. The Court has reviewed the parties' status reports, and at this time will allow a discovery deadline to be set and briefing on summary judgment motions. Discovery is to be completed by 10/22/2021. A telephone status hearing is set for 10/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 8:45 a.m. is reset for 9:00 a.m. Time change only. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STATUS Report Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.'s Joint Status Report by AT&T Services, Inc. (Coates, Kendell)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS Report by Tekway Inc. (Mathias, Damon)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time #37 is granted. The 6/15/2021 status report deadline is extended to 6/21/2021. The telephone status hearing set for 6/22/2021 is reset for 6/24/2021 at 8:45 a.m. The same dial-in information shall apply. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. for extension of time Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time of Time to File Status Report (Coates, Kendell)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. by Kendell Raphael Coates Appearance of Kendell R. Coates (Coates, Kendell)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing is set for 6/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: AT&T's motion to stay #28 is continued. The status reports described in the attached order are due June 15, 2021. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #32 is granted. Attorney Jenna Kim terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Attorney Jenna Kim to withdraw as attorney for AT&T Services, Inc.. No party information provided (Kim, Jenna)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to motion to stay #28 (Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Siegel, Kathryn)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE by Tekway Inc. to MOTION by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to stay (Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings) #28 (Mathias, Damon)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule as to the motion to stay #28 : Plaintiff's response is due by 4/16/2021, Defendant's reply is due by 4/30/2021. The status hearing set for 4/1/2021 is vacated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to stay (Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplier Subcontracting Agreement)(Siegel, Kathryn)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATUS Report PLAINTIFF by Tekway Inc. (Mathias, Damon)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing is set for 4/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. If a motion to stay is filed before then, the Court will set an earlier date to hear the motion. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STATUS Report by AT&T Services, Inc. (Siegel, Kathryn)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is denied as moot. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: AT&T's motion to dismiss #12 is denied in part and granted in part. The motion is denied in all respects except that any claim for tortious interference with contract based on the non-compete provisions is dismissed without prejudice. If Tekway believes it can cure the deficiencies outlined above with respect to these claims, Tekway may file a motion for leave to amend of no more than five pages attaching the amended complaint as an exhibit. The parties should submit a status report proposing a discovery schedule by March 18, 2021. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to order on motion to strike,, text entry, #21 (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff Tekway's Motion to Strike) (Siegel, Kathryn)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's motion to strike #20 is denied without prejudice in that the Court will not strike any exhibits at this time. Instead, the Court construes the motion to be a request for leave to file a sur-reply and will consider Plaintiff's brief along with the briefs already filed on the motion to dismiss #12 . Defendant may file a further response brief of no more than five pages by 2/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Tekway Inc. to strike reply, #19 Exhibits (Mathias, Damon)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #12 (Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Kumar Affidavit Chart, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Denise Perez Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Rebecca Abraham Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Erin Stewart Declaration)(Siegel, Kathryn)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Tekway Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mathias, Damon)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #15 is granted. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due by 11/16/2020. Defendant's reply is due by 12/21/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Tekway Inc. for order proposed Order on P's Motion for Extension of Time (Mathias, Damon)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Tekway Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Mathias, Damon)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The court adopts the parties' agreed proposed briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 . Response is due by 11/2/2020. Reply is due by 12/7/2020. The telephone conference set for 9/30/2020 is vacated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by AT&T Services, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #12 (Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Siegel, Kathryn)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Siegel, Kathryn)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone conference held on 9/11/2020. Motion for extension of time to answer #9 is granted. Defendants have until 9/28/2020 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint. Telephone hearing continued to 9/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m. if the parties are unable to submit an agreed briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to dismiss. Please call (877)402-9757, access code 4410831 to participate in the hearing. Mailed notice (ecw, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephonic motion hearing set for 9/11/2020 at 09:30 AM as to motion for extension of time to file answer #9 . Please call (877)402-9757, access code 4410831 to participate in the hearing. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Defendant's Second Opposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Correspondence between Ms. Kim and Mr. Mathias)(Siegel, Kathryn)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Defendant's Opposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Siegel, Kathryn)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. by Jenna Kim (Kim, Jenna)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. by Kathryn E. Siegel (Siegel, Kathryn)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. by Shanthi V. Gaur (Gaur, Shanthi)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tekway Inc. as to AT&T Services, Inc. on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Mathias, Damon)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. (ng, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mathias, Damon)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice.(aee, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tekway Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17206781.(Mathias, Damon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tekway Inc. v. AT&T Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tekway Inc.
Represented By: Damon E. Mathias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna Kim
Represented By: Kathryn E. Siegel
Represented By: Shanthi V. Gaur
Represented By: Kendell Raphael Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?