Oak Creek Partners, LLC v. GreaseShield USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Oak Creek Partners, LLC
Defendant: GreaseShield USA, LLC, f/k/a Environmental Products and Services, LLC, GreaseShield USA, LLC and Environmental Products and Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04117
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sheila M Finnegan
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Telephone conference held on 9/10/2020 for discussion of settlement issues. Settlement conference (by videoconference) is tentatively set for 11/6/2020 at 9 a.m. subject to counsel conferring with their respective clients. By 9/13/2020, counsel are to send a joint email to chambers_finnegan@ilnd.uscourts.gov that either confirms this date/time or seeks an alternative, and that also proposes dates for the exchange of settlement letters. Counsel are advised that all participants must be available one hour prior to the settlement conference to receive and open a link to Microsoft Teams and be instructed by the courtroom deputy on how to enable the video, unmute the sound, and navigate between a joint virtual room and separate virtual rooms. By agreement, the parties will continue their ongoing exchange of written discovery and documents since this will be helpful to settlement negotiations. While they are not foreclosed from engaging in other discovery, including depositions, they are in agreement that to the extent possible discovery should be deferred until after the settlement conference to minimize fees and costs. To that end, the Court has agreed not to impose any discovery deadlines until after the settlement conference. Mailed notice (sxw, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Telephone conference is set on 9/10/2020 at 1:00 p.m.Mailed notice (sxw, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, set/extend discovery deadlines, and settlement.(rao, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Oak Creek Partners, LLC re status report #13 (Bauch, Paul)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Oak Creek Partners, LLC (Bauch, Paul)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Oak Creek Partners, LLC re answer to counterclaim #11 (Bauch, Paul)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to counterclaim by Oak Creek Partners, LLC(Bauch, Paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIM filed by GreaseShield USA, LLC against Oak Creek Partners, LLC . by GreaseShield USA, LLC(Hachikian, Adam)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GreaseShield USA, LLC by Adam A Hachikian (Hachikian, Adam)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oak Creek Partners, LLC as to GreaseShield USA, LLC on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Bauch, Paul)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant GreaseShield USA, LLC (sxh, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oak Creek Partners, LLC by Paul M. Bauch (Bauch, Paul)
July 14, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oak Creek Partners, LLC by Carolina Y. Sales (Sales, Carolina)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sales, Carolina)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Oak Creek Partners, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17211554. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sales, Carolina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oak Creek Partners, LLC v. GreaseShield USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreaseShield USA, LLC, f/k/a Environmental Products and Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreaseShield USA, LLC
Represented By: Adam A Hachikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Products and Services, LLC
Represented By: Adam A Hachikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oak Creek Partners, LLC
Represented By: Carolina Y. Sales
Represented By: Paul M. Bauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?