Westfield Insurance v. Coverall North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance
Defendant: Coverall North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04133
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance as to Coverall North America, Inc. on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Christenson, Teirney)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance regarding Summons & Complaint served on Coverall North America, Inc. on 8/26/2020 (Christenson, Teirney)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The telephonic initial status hearing set for 9/10/2020 is stricken and reset for 9/30/2020 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The deadline for the parties to file their initial joint status report as required by the Court's 7/14/2020 order #5 is extended to 9/23/2020. Mailed notice (dal, )
July 16, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Coverall North America, Inc. (mp, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 9:30 AM. The status hearing will proceed by telephone conference. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
July 14, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Westfield Insurance (Christenson, Teirney)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Westfield Insurance by Teirney S Christenson (Christenson, Teirney)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Christenson, Teirney)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Westfield Insurance; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17214535.(Christenson, Teirney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance v. Coverall North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coverall North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?