Trex Properties LLC v. Able Electropolishing Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trex Properties LLC
Defendant: Revcor, Inc., Fabricated Metals Co., Lipke-Kentex Corporation, Grove Industries Inc., Imperial Plating Company of Illinois, Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., Dove Dry Cleaning Inc., Spectrum Brands Inc., Independent Environmental Services, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Quality Metal Finishing Co., Getzen Co., Deltrol Corp., Trumpet Holdings, Inc., Barron Metal Finishing, LLC, Sine Systems Corporation, Plastic Coatings Corp., GL Tool and Manufacturing Co., Cosco Industries, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Landis + Gyr, Inc., Maid-O-Mist LLC, Arris Group Inc., Light Logic LLC, Anchor Scientific Inc., The Line Group Inc., ACE ANODIZING & IMPREGNATING INC., Siemens Industry Inc., Duratherm Processing Systems, Inc., Ex-Cell Kaiser LLC, James Precious Metals Plating, Inc., Belvedere USA, LLC, Thermal Transfer Products, MJ Celco Inc., Arlington Plating Company, Platford Corp., Enviro Tech International Inc., X-L Engineering Corp., Plano Metal Specialties, Inc., JStone, Inc., Billet Specialties, Inc., D&W Fine Pack LLC, Aimtron Systems, LLC, Cintas Corp., Pacific Scientific Company, Voestalpine Precision Strip, LLC, Naval Facilities Engineering Command, Tornado Industries LLC, Chem-Impex International, Inc., G&M Manufacturing Corporation, Rome Metal Mfg. Inc., Nova Wildcat Shur-Line, LLC, Ohmite Holdings, L.L.C., E.J. Basler Co., Innovative Certified Technical Plating, LLC, AVANTI ENGINEERING, INC., Entron Controls, LLC, RHMI Inc., John Crane Group, LLC, Berteau-Lowell Plating Works Inc., Richards-Wilcox, Inc., CKI Locker, LLC, Ikonix USA LLC, Precision Forming & Stamping Co. Inc., Castle Metal Finishing Corp., Tenex Corporation, Dual Manufacturing Co., Inc., JLO Metal Products Company, Inc., Plymouth Tube Co., AFCO Products, Inc., Empire Bronze Corporation, Able Electropolishing Company, Inc., SWPC Investment LLC, Alfa Laval Inc., UCAL Systems, Inc., Hestia Heat Treat Inc., KKSP Precision Machining LLC, Meaden Precision Machined Products Co., AMI Industries, Inc., Head Manufacturing Inc., Greif, Inc., Acme Auto Electric II, Inc., Buhrke Industries, LLC, TLK Industries, Inc., Fox Valley Systems, Inc. and United States Department of Energy
Case Number: 1:2020cv04159
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION by Defendant Ikonix USA LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Citera, Francis)
September 11, 2020 Filing 63 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Head Manufacturing Inc. by Andrew Shilling Johnson (Johnson, Andrew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Head Manufacturing Inc. by Daniel E. Beederman (Beederman, Daniel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 61 Disclosure Statement by Arris Group Inc. (LaRose, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Arris Group Inc.(LaRose, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arris Group Inc. by Costandinos J Diamond (Diamond, Costandinos)
September 10, 2020 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arris Group Inc. by Marissa Renee Alaska (Alaska, Marissa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arris Group Inc. by Joseph A. Bosco (Bosco, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arris Group Inc. by Mark Anthony LaRose (LaRose, Mark)
September 9, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Independent Environmental Services, Inc. without Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. KKSP Precision Machining LLC waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Honeywell International Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Alfa Laval Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Ex-Cell Kaiser LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Landis + Gyr, Inc. without Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Empire Bronze Corporation with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Duratherm Processing Systems, Inc. (Merryman, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant AFCO Products, Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant D&W Fine Pack LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Spectrum Brands Inc. (Merryman, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant John Crane Group, LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Barron Metal Finishing, LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Thermal Transfer Products with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Independent Environmental Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant G&M Manufacturing Corporation with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Buhrke Industries, LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Billet Specialties, Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Nova Wildcat Shur-Line, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Ace Anodizing & Impregnating Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. TLK Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Spectrum Brands Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Landis Gyr, Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Ex-Cell Kaiser LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Enviro Tech International Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Barron Metal Finishing, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 14, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Buhrke Industries, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Castle Metal Finishing Corp. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant ENTRON Controls, LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Light Logic LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant GL Tool and Manufacturing Co. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Avanti Engineering, Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Duratherm Processing Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Siemens Industry Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Quality Metal Finishing Co. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Merryman, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Arris Group Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Voestalpine Precision Strip, LLC with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Dual Manufacturing Co., Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ikonix USA LLC by Francis A Citera (Citera, Francis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Ikonix USA LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Tenex Corporation with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Innovative Certified Technical Plating, LLC d/b/a InCerTec with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Tornado Industries LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Cintas Corp. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Chem-Impex, International, Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trex Properties LLC as to Defendant Able Electropolishing Co. Inc. with Prejudice (Merryman, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trex Properties LLC. Head Manufacturing Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shaffie, Ambereen)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trex Properties LLC by Ambereen Khalid Shaffie (Shaffie, Ambereen)
July 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather M. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trex Properties LLC by Rachel D. Guthrie (Guthrie, Rachel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trex Properties LLC by Matthew Travers Merryman (Merryman, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Merryman, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trex Properties LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17218573.(Merryman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trex Properties LLC v. Able Electropolishing Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revcor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabricated Metals Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipke-Kentex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grove Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Plating Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dove Dry Cleaning Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Brands Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Environmental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Metal Finishing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getzen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deltrol Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumpet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron Metal Finishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sine Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastic Coatings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GL Tool and Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosco Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landis + Gyr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maid-O-Mist LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arris Group Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Bosco
Represented By: Costandinos J Diamond
Represented By: Marissa Renee Alaska
Represented By: Mark Anthony LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light Logic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Scientific Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Line Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE ANODIZING & IMPREGNATING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duratherm Processing Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ex-Cell Kaiser LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Precious Metals Plating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belvedere USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermal Transfer Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJ Celco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington Plating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platford Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enviro Tech International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X-L Engineering Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plano Metal Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JStone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billet Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&W Fine Pack LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimtron Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Scientific Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voestalpine Precision Strip, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naval Facilities Engineering Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tornado Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chem-Impex International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&M Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rome Metal Mfg. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Wildcat Shur-Line, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohmite Holdings, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.J. Basler Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Certified Technical Plating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVANTI ENGINEERING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entron Controls, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHMI Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berteau-Lowell Plating Works Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards-Wilcox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKI Locker, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikonix USA LLC
Represented By: Francis A Citera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Forming & Stamping Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Metal Finishing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dual Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLO Metal Products Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plymouth Tube Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFCO Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Bronze Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able Electropolishing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWPC Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCAL Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hestia Heat Treat Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKSP Precision Machining LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meaden Precision Machined Products Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Manufacturing Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Shilling Johnson
Represented By: Daniel E. Beederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greif, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acme Auto Electric II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buhrke Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLK Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Valley Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trex Properties LLC
Represented By: Rachel D. Guthrie
Represented By: Ambereen Khalid Shaffie
Represented By: Matthew Travers Merryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?