King et al v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Devontae Honey, Joseph Wilkins and Howard L. King
Defendant: Thomas Dart, Supertendent Div 2, Sergent Dunn and Sergent Day
Case Number: 1:2020cv04195
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation (postmarked 8/27/20) #8 is denied as moot. This case was dismissed without prejudice on 8/27/20, for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's previous order. The matter remains closed. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/3/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED, for document #6 sent to Howard L. King returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Re-mailed to PO Box 1326, Harvey, IL 60426. (sxb, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Howard L. King for attorney representation (Exhibit) (Envelope postmarked 8/26/2020) (sxb, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 8/27/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/27/2020: By order dated July 20, 2020, the Court denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice and ordered Plaintiff to either submit a properly completed application or pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee. (Dkt. #5 ) In addition, the Court dismissed Plaintiff's complaint because it failed to state a claim on which relief could be granted but allowed Plaintiff leave to amend his pleading if he believed he could state a valid federal claim. (Id.) At that time, the Court warned Plaintiff that failure to fully comply with the Court's order by August 17, 2020, would result in dismissal of this case. Plaintiff has not submitted a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the Court's filing fee to date. Nor has he submitted an amended complaint. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all pending motions as moot. Case closed. Mailed notice (cn).
July 21, 2020 MAILED Copy of Order dated 7/20/20, an in forma pauperis application, an amended civil rights complaint form, a blank USM-285 form to Plaintiff. (aee, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff King's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. The complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to: (1) dismiss and terminate all Plaintiffs except Plaintiff King, without prejudice to the dismissed Plaintiffs initiating separate lawsuits as to their own experiences; (2) amend the docket to reflect that King is the sole Plaintiff; (3) turn off future notices to the dismissed Plaintiffs; and (4) send Plaintiff King an in forma pauperis application, an amended civil rights complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and a copy of this order. By August 17, 2020, if he wishes to proceed with this action individually, King must: (1) address the filing fee by either: (a) prepaying $400 by check or money order payable to the Clerk of Court; or (b) submitting a complete in forma pauperis application; (2) submit an amended complaint on the Court's required form; and (3) submit a completed USM-285 form for each Defendant. If he fails to comply with the foregoing directives by that date, this case will be summarily dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/20/2020. Mailed notice (aee, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Howard L. King for attorney representation. (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Howard L. King for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Devontae Honey, Howard L. King, Joseph Wilkins, (Attachments: #1 Envelope post marked 7/9/2020, Exhibits)(nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devontae Honey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supertendent Div 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergent Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergent Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?