Burgess v. Brockhart et al
Petitioner: Herbert Burgess
Respondent: Brookhart, Attorney General of the State of Illinois and Dr. Deanna Brockhart
Case Number: 1:2020cv04216
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Deanna Brockhart by Richard Joseph Cook (Cook, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition #1 by November 6, 2020. Petitioner shall reply by January 8, 2021. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Respondent Attorney General of the State of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/8/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 statutory filing fee by September 21, 2020. Failure to comply with this order may result in summary dismissal of this case. Petitioner's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied as premature. The Clerk is instructed to update the docket to reflect that Respondent is Dr. Deanna Brockhart, Acting Warden, Lawrence Correctional Center. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/21/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 FILED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Herbert Burgess (Exhibits) (sxb, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Petitioner Herbert Burgess for attorney representation. (smm, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Petitioner Herbert Burgess for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Herbert Burgess against Attorney General of the State of Illinois, Brookhart; (Affidavit);(Attachments). (smm, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Brockhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brookhart
Represented By: Chief of Criminal Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Deanna Brockhart
Represented By: Chief of Criminal Appeals
Represented By: Richard Joseph Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herbert Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?