Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Bullitt Mobile LLC
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Bullitt Mobile LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04218
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 MAILED patent report with certified copy of minute order dated 7/28/2020 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 certified order) (bg, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #8 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bullitt Mobile LLC (cp, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 10/6/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 20 CV 4218, Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Bullitt Mobile LLC, before the Hon. Sharon Johnson Coleman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating; therefore It is hereby ordered that 20 CV 4218, Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Bullitt Mobile LLC, is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/2020. (bg, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Clerk of Court is to arrange for this case to be transferred to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. by Isaac Philip Rabicoff (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Patent Infringement filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17226191. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Bullitt Mobile LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullitt Mobile LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?